Sanchez et al v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Plaintiff: M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez, A.D., a minor and Dolly Vierra
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06929
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 56 Statement Plaintiff's Status Conference Statement by A.D., a minor, M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez, Dolly Vierra. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
September 9, 2021 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Status Conference held by AT&T Conference on 9/9/2021. (Total Time in Court: 13 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Ruhandy Glezakos and Joshua Nassir. Defendant Attorney: David T. Martin and Eric J. Weiss. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Status Conference set for 3/31/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME ON THE STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:15 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge William Alsup.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE RE 9/9/2021 HEARING: Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup will be held by telephone. Please allow adequate time to check-in with the courtroom deputy by connecting to the teleconference line 10 minutes prior to the scheduled start time. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Cara V. Wallace. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by David T. Martin. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Cara V. Wallace ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16282128.) filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David T. Martin ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16282082.) filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Dover Swan for Nintendo of America Inc. (Swan, Madeline) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
March 13, 2021 Filing 46 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/3/21, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #45 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2021. (Related documents(s) #45 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/13/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/03/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Nintendo of America Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 3, 2021 Case Stayed (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2021 by AT&T Conference line re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss. The Court ORDERED that the issue of whether there is a properly formed and enforceable arbitration agreement shall be sent to the arbitrator in accordance with paragraph 7(A) and the case shall be STAYED pending that determination. The clerk shall set a status conference for approximately six months from today. Total Time in Court: 42 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Benjamin Heikali / Ruhany Glezakos. Defendant Attorney: Eric Weiss / Mallory Webster. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss set for 2/25/2021 is continued to 3/3/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss ) filed byNintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Kristopher Kiel in Support of Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration)(Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties and the Court's order at #39 , the Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 is VACATED pending a decision on #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order RE #38 STIPULATED REQUEST TO TEMPORARILY STAY DISCOVERY AND ADR DEADLINES. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 38 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO TEMPORARILY STAY DISCOVERY AND ADR DEADLINES filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss ) filed byA.D., a minor, M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez, Dolly Vierra. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Luz Sanchez In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of M.S. In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, #4 Declaration of Dolly Vierra In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, #5 Declaration of A.D. In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
December 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Nintendo of America Inc. re #26 Notice (Other) Statement In Support of Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #26 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Statement Opposing Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by A.D., a minor, M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez, Dolly Vierra. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 is continued to 2/25/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup, to be held in conjunction with the motion hearing as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties and the Court's order at #32 , the Motion Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss set for 1/21/2021 is continued to 2/25/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE #30 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE OR COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines Regarding Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss filed by A.D., a minor, M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez, Dolly Vierra. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali In Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadlines Regarding Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Burman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: #1 Pro Hac Vice) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15285045.) filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Burman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/18/2020. Replies due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristopher Kiel in Support of Nintendo of America Inc.s Motion to Transfer or Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Nintendo of America Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Nintendo of America Inc.. Filed byLuz Sanchez, M.S., a minor, Dolly Vierra, A.D., a minor. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mallory Gitt Webster. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Weiss. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15119571.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/27/2020 filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Webster, Mallory) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15119502.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/27/2020 filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mallory Gitt Webster. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Weiss. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2021 is continued to 1/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING re #11 Stipulation to Extend Time for Nintendo to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #15 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. Filed in error. Plaintiff file d a declination. Case will be reassigned. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15119571.) filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Webster, Mallory) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15119502.) filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Weiss, Eric) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Nintendo of America Inc. to Answer or Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nintendo of America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NCL for Nintendo of America Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nintendo of America Inc. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Wei-Ming Wetherell for Defendant Nintendo of America Inc. (Wetherell, Jasmine) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez.. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Sanchez, M.S., a minor. Nintendo of America Inc. served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.S., a minor, Luz Sanchez (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nintendo of America Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nintendo of America Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15024557.). Filed byLuz Sanchez, M.S., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Represented By: Mallory Gitt Webster
Represented By: Eric J. Weiss
Represented By: Jasmine Wei-Ming Wetherell
Represented By: Cara V. Wallace
Represented By: David Burman
Represented By: David T. Martin
Represented By: Madeline Dover Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S., a minor
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Sanchez
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D., a minor
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolly Vierra
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?