Rasmussen et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rulon V. Rasmussen, Theodore Knox, Jay Jeter, Stacy M. Lambertz, Michelle E. Ferrell, Nina Bagley, Teresa F. Lancaster, Shannon N. Reilly, Joy L. Pyne, John F. Rivers, Richard Bies, Steven L. Cohen, Karen M. Corvasce, Vincent A. Wolodkin, David F. Richie, Gerald T. Murphy, Ralph Baker, Jesus Martinez, Eytan M. Wohl, Andre A. Davis, Andrew M. Shafer, Louis F. Rosen, Eileen Swanson, Carla A. Clancy, Bertha L. Solis, Roger Blumer, Robert Fone, Linda S. Scheilz, Junior M. Harbin, Ellen S. Cullen, Deshon R. Goodman, Sherri Lucas, Marty Watson, Lenise T. Diggs, Michele Vitela, Donna M. Pauley, Constance Winstead, Daniel Morgan, Sr., William DeLuca, Angelique Pham, Julie Wilcox, Edward E. Franklin, Clifford A. Day, Peter Dautel, Ohannes Bedrossian, Michael W. Lowdermilk, Ryan D. White, Barry S. Braverman, Kendra C. Mowry, Anna Brooks and Mark K. Phigler
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Grocery Outlet, Pfizer Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation and The Vons Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06947
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/29/2020, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #33 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2021. (Related documents(s) #33 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 36 Certified copies of #35 Order of Remand and docket sheet sent to Lake County Superior Court. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATIONS TO STRIKE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND REMANDING TO STATE COURT granting (25) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (30) Motion ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06947-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (34) Motion ; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06948-SI; granting (15) Administrative Motion ; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06953-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (33) Motion in case 3:20-cv-06954-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (31) Motion ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06955-SI; granting (25) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (30) Motion ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06960-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/29/20 before Judge Susan Illston by Nina Bagley, Ralph Baker, Ohannes Bedrossian, Richard Bies, Roger Blumer, Barry S. Braverman, Anna Brooks, Carla A. Clancy, Steven L. Cohen, Karen M. Corvasce, Ellen S. Cullen, Peter Dautel, Andre A. Davis, Clifford A. Day, William DeLuca, Lenise T. Diggs, Michelle E. Ferrell, Robert Fone, Edward E. Franklin, Deshon R. Goodman, Junior M. Harbin, Jay Jeter, Theodore Knox, Stacy M. Lambertz, Teresa F. Lancaster, Michael W. Lowdermilk, Sherri Lucas, Jesus Martinez, Daniel Morgan, Sr, Kendra C. Mowry, Gerald T. Murphy, Donna M. Pauley, Angelique Pham, Mark K. Phigler, Joy L. Pyne, Rulon V. Rasmussen, Shannon N. Reilly, David F. Richie, John F. Rivers, Louis F. Rosen, Linda S. Scheilz, Andrew M. Shafer, Bertha L. Solis, Eileen Swanson, Michele Vitela, Marty Watson, Ryan D. White, Julie Wilcox, Constance Winstead, Eytan M. Wohl, Vincent A. Wolodkin, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/29/2020 before Judge Susan Illston by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Cheffo, Mark) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Ex Parte Motion to Strike Removal and Remand Case Hearing held on 10/29/2020. Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Brent Wisner (Chung, Cook, Rasmussen), Jennifer Moore (Bonvino, Ingram, Henderson). Defendant Attorney: Mark Cheffo (GlaxoSmithKline LLC), Fritz Zimmer (Boehringer Ingelheim Entities), Paige Sharpe (Sanofi Entities), Jessica Rydstrom Pfizer, Inc.), Sophia Castillo (Grocery Outlet, Inc.), Robert Guite (Kaiser Permanente International, Inc.), Sarah Johnston (Safeway, Inc. and The Vons Companies, Inc.). (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Combined Ex Parte Motion Hearing re: Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is requ ired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 27, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 COMBINED MOTION for Court Order finding that the Brand Defendants have no obligation to answer or otherwise respond to complaints, or alternatively, an extension of time to file responsive pleadings until November 30, 2020. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2020 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to:(8 in 3:20-cv-06947-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, (11 in 3:20-cv-06948-SI) MOTION to Stay , (10 in 3:20-cv-06953-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, (6 in 3:20-cv-06954-SI) MOTION to Stay , (9 in 3:20-cv-06955-SI) Amended MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 8, (9 in 3:20-cv-06960-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY (re #25 First Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case ) filed byNina Bagley, Ralph Baker, Ohannes Bedrossian, Richard Bies, Roger Blumer, Barry S. Braverman, Anna Brooks, Carla A. Clancy, Steven L. Cohen, Karen M. Corvasce, Ellen S. Cullen, Peter Dautel, Andre A. Davis, Clifford A. Day, William DeLuca, Lenise T. Diggs, Michelle E. Ferrell, Robert Fone, Edward E. Franklin, Deshon R. Goodman, Junior M. Harbin, Jay Jeter, Theodore Knox, Stacy M. Lambertz, Teresa F. Lancaster, Michael W. Lowdermilk, Sherri Lucas, Jesus Martinez, Daniel Morgan, Sr, Kendra C. Mowry, Gerald T. Murphy, Donna M. Pauley, Angelique Pham, Mark K. Phigler, Joy L. Pyne, Rulon V. Rasmussen, Shannon N. Reilly, David F. Richie, John F. Rivers, Louis F. Rosen, Linda S. Scheilz, Andrew M. Shafer, Bertha L. Solis, Eileen Swanson, Michele Vitela, Marty Watson, Ryan D. White, Julie Wilcox, Constance Winstead, Eytan M. Wohl, Vincent A. Wolodkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript (Chung v. Safeway, RG200773289))(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 First Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case ) filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Podsiadlo)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Podsiadlo)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 25 Combined Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Nina Bagley, Ralph Baker, Ohannes Bedrossian, Richard Bies, Roger Blumer, Barry S. Braverman, Anna Brooks, Carla A. Clancy, Steven L. Cohen, Karen M. Corvasce, Ellen S. Cullen, Peter Dautel, Andre A. Davis, Clifford A. Day, William DeLuca, Lenise T. Diggs, Michelle E. Ferrell, Robert Fone, Edward E. Franklin, Deshon R. Goodman, Junior M. Harbin, Jay Jeter, Theodore Knox, Stacy M. Lambertz, Teresa F. Lancaster, Michael W. Lowdermilk, Sherri Lucas, Jesus Martinez, Daniel Morgan, Sr, Kendra C. Mowry, Gerald T. Murphy, Donna M. Pauley, Angelique Pham, Mark K. Phigler, Joy L. Pyne, Rulon V. Rasmussen, Shannon N. Reilly, David F. Richie, John F. Rivers, Louis F. Rosen, Linda S. Scheilz, Andrew M. Shafer, Bertha L. Solis, Eileen Swanson, Michele Vitela, Marty Watson, Ryan D. White, Julie Wilcox, Constance Winstead, Eytan M. Wohl, Vincent A. Wolodkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sosa Order, #2 Declaration of Nour Abdelhady, #3 Declaration of Edward Franklin, #4 Declaration of Nathan Gibbons, #5 Declaration of John Papanicolas, #6 Declaration of Gregory Stephens, #7 Declaration of Jack Thompson, #8 Declaration of Ryan White, #9 Declaration of Laurie Woods, #10 Declaration of Kenneth Wright, #11 Proposed Order) (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2020) Modified on 10/21/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2020 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed byBoehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byNina Bagley, Ralph Baker, Ohannes Bedrossian, Richard Bies, Roger Blumer, Barry S. Braverman, Anna Brooks, Carla A. Clancy, Steven L. Cohen, Karen M. Corvasce, Ellen S. Cullen, Peter Dautel, Andre A. Davis, Clifford A. Day, William DeLuca, Lenise T. Diggs, Michelle E. Ferrell, Robert Fone, Edward E. Franklin, Deshon R. Goodman, Junior M. Harbin, Jay Jeter, Theodore Knox, Stacy M. Lambertz, Teresa F. Lancaster, Michael W. Lowdermilk, Sherri Lucas, Jesus Martinez, Daniel Morgan, Sr, Kendra C. Mowry, Gerald T. Murphy, Donna M. Pauley, Angelique Pham, Mark K. Phigler, Joy L. Pyne, Rulon V. Rasmussen, Shannon N. Reilly, David F. Richie, John F. Rivers, Louis F. Rosen, Linda S. Scheilz, Andrew M. Shafer, Bertha L. Solis, Eileen Swanson, Michele Vitela, Marty Watson, Ryan D. White, Julie Wilcox, Constance Winstead, Eytan M. Wohl, Vincent A. Wolodkin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Gibbons, #2 Declaration of Gregory Stephens, #3 Declaration of Kenneth Wright)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/14/20. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Inc. (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Pfizer Inc. (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/8/2020) Modified on 10/8/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Grocery Outlet, Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc., Safeway Health, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, The Vons Companies, Inc. Notice of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation re #9 Notice of Appearance, #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Replies due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/8/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from Lake County Superior Court. Their case number is CV421204. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-15027813). Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/8/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rulon V. Rasmussen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Knox
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Jeter
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy M. Lambertz
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle E. Ferrell
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Bagley
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa F. Lancaster
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon N. Reilly
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy L. Pyne
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Rivers
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bies
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Cohen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Corvasce
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A. Wolodkin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Richie
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald T. Murphy
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Baker
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Martinez
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eytan M. Wohl
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre A. Davis
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Shafer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis F. Rosen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Swanson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla A. Clancy
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha L. Solis
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Blumer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fone
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Scheilz
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior M. Harbin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen S. Cullen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshon R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Lucas
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Watson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenise T. Diggs
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Vitela
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Pauley
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Winstead
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Morgan, Sr.
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William DeLuca
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelique Pham
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Wilcox
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Franklin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Day
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Dautel
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohannes Bedrossian
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Lowdermilk
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. White
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry S. Braverman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra C. Mowry
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Brooks
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark K. Phigler
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Represented By: Moe Keshavarzi
Represented By: Jennifer E. Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet
Represented By: Monica Marie Browner
Represented By: John Clifton McCarron
Represented By: Sophia Castillo
Represented By: Ashley Boulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?