Synopsys, Inc. v. Library Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Defendant: Library Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07014
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2020 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Library Technologies, Inc. re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaims, and Exhibits 1 and 2 Thereto (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 12/5/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Synopsys, Inc. byLibrary Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rebecca B. Horton, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaims, and Exhibits 1 and 2 Thereto filed by Library Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rebecca B. Horton, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED Version of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, and Breach of Contract and Counterclaims, #4 REDACTED Version of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, and Breach of Contract and Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2)(Horton, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 14, 2020 Filing 42 Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on October 21, 2020, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #36 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2021. (Related documents(s) #36 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Stipulation filed by Library Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/2/2020. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Library Technologies, Inc.. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Library Technologies, Inc. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Library Technologies, Inc. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2020 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Synopsys, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2020 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Library Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re #17 Motion for TRO, expedited discovery, and entry of N.D. Cal Model Protective Order. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 34 Proposed Order [Granting Plaintiff Synopsys, Inc.s Motion For (1) Preliminary Injunction; (2) Expedited Discovery; And (3) Entry of N.D. Cal. Model Protective Order] by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2020 - Re #17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction filed by Synopsys, Inc. Counsel have stipulated to the terms of the TRO and Preliminary Injunction. The Court Grants the Motions. Plaintiff's counsel shall submit a proposed order. (Total Time in Court: 19 Minutes) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Denise Mingrone and Maria Sokova; Client: Shanee Y. W. Nelson. Defendant Attorney: Colby B. Springer, Nitin Gambhir and Rebecca Horton. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mark Howard Rogge (Rogge, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Sanjay Mohan Nangia (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 10/21/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY (re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) DEFENDANT LIBRARY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR (1) A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND (3) ORDER FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (DKT. NO. 17) filed byLibrary Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of CBS ISO Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Nikolaevna Sokova (Sokova, Maria) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Blaire Horton (Horton, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Nitin Gambhir (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby Brian Springer (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #24 Stipulation. Responsive brief due by October 20, 2020. Motion hearing set for October 21, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SYNOPSYS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BRIEFING filed by Library Technologies, Inc.. (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Howard Rogge (Rogge, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Mohan Nangia (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Objections due by 10/20/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 3:00 PM in Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 20, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Objections due by 10/20/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 03:0 0 PM in Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. of Order re Motion for TRO (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synopsys, Inc.. Library Technologies, Inc. served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/15/2020. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for TRO Hearing set for 10/20/2020 at 3:00 PM in Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identif ied by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 19, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 03:00 PM in Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. B reyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Proposed Protective Order for Litigation] by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Norman F. Kelly, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Norman F. Kelly Decl., #3 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone, #4 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synopsys, Inc... (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ( ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for all further proceedings re #9 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/9/2020. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Library Technologies, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synopsys, Inc... (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT 17 U.S.C. 1201, ET SEQ., AND BREACH OF CONTRACT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15039951.). Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 10/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synopsys, Inc. v. Library Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Represented By: Denise Marie Mingrone
Represented By: Maria Nikolaevna Sokova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Library Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Blaire Horton
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Represented By: Mark Howard Rogge
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Represented By: Colby Brian Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?