Drevalera v. Justices of the California Court of Appeal for the First District, Division Four et al
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera and Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Defendant: Honorable Justice Tracie Brown, Honorable Justice Jon Streeter, Honorable Justice Alison Tucher, Honorable Justice Pollak Stuart and Justices of the California Court of Appeal for the First District, Division Four
Case Number: 3:2020cv07017
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Revoke the NTPC's Demurrer and Motion to Strike my Complaint No. RG20061108 Drevaleva v. Harding because Defendant Harding was never served with a Summons and a Complaint filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Responses due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Drevaleva, Tatyana) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate the Judgment #12 Order on Report and Recommendations, filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/14/2021. Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Drevaleva, Tatyana) (Filed on 12/31/2020) Modified on 1/4/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #4 Report and Recommendations; Order of Dismissal and Judgment. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Transfer my lawsuit No. 3:20-cv-07017-WHA to the Hon. Judge James Donato filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Drevaleva, Tatyana) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Proof of Electronic Service by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO THE OCTOBER 09, 2020 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Report and Recommendations, by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/9/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandate against Tracie Brown, Justices of the California Court of Appeal for the First District, Division Four, Jon Streeter, Pollak Stuart, Alison Tucher (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drevalera v. Justices of the California Court of Appeal for the First District, Division Four et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevalera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Justice Tracie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Justice Jon Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Justice Alison Tucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Justice Pollak Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justices of the California Court of Appeal for the First District, Division Four
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?