Bentley et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wing, Adan Moya, Jennifer Grace, Coresa Trimble and Dianne Bentley
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited, Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Payment Corp., Google Commerce Limited and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv07079
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lodging ("Statement Regarding Protective Order") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google's Proposed Protective Order,, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order,)(Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/26/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lodging ("Joint Notice Regarding Status of Protective Order") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Lodging ("STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of ESI") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lodging ("STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Coordination of Discovery") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lodging ("AMENDED COMPLAINT for Consolidated Consumer Classes against All Defendants") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/22/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lodging ("Joint Proposed Plan for Discovery Coordination and Case Scheduling") by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing, Google Payment Corp., Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited and Google LLC. (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/19/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #12 Elizabeth A. McKenna's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Robert A. Wallner's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elizabeth A. McKenna ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15066432.) filed by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (McKenna, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert A. Wallner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15066315.) filed by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (Wallner, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Michael A. Acciavatti's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Blake H. Yagman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #5 Peggy J. Wedgworth's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A. Acciavatti ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15063050.) filed by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (Acciavatti, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Blake H. Yagman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062762.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/14/2020 filed by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (Yagman, Blake) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Peggy J. Wedgworth ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15062585.) filed by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodging of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Dianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Adan Moya, Coresa Trimble, Robert Wing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Azar, David) (Filed on 10/13/2020) Modified on 10/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No Process) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15048116.). Filed byDianne Bentley, Jennifer Grace, Coresa Trimble, Adan Moya, Robert Wing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azar, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020) Modified on 10/13/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Payment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Commerce Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wing
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Moya
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Grace
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coresa Trimble
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Bentley
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?