Asher et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charles L. Asher and Belinda Asher
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv07215
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:20-cv-00383. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of Nebraska, 8:20cv00383JMGMDN, Asher et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-07215-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 237 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Monsanto Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Belinda Asher, Charles L Asher from District Court of Holt County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-136 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4243793) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asher et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Asher
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Asher
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?