Lindvall v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Lindvall
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv07218
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC-Northern Georgia, 1:20-cv-03853, Lindvall v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as CV 20-7218 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-237 cc: JPMDL (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03853. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-237 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. MDL NO. 2741. (rjs)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Lindvall. Monsanto Company waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/21/2020. (tmf)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDED ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (kt)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (kt)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel Lindvall. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10154940) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindvall v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lindvall
Represented By: Gordon Van Remmen
Represented By: Christopher Baker Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?