Manown et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: David R. Holland, Rosalind Tansier, Jana L. Richardson, Binh Nguyen, Antoine Reels, Reghan Berry, Marsha Watson, Colton J. Powell, Raymond E. Bonin, Jonathan M. Hambrick, Daniel Brunot, Sandi L. Nagy, Edward L. Stoessel, Katherine A. Mole, John Vance, Breanna M. Post, Christopher J. Peterson, Sue Shears, George H. Wtiz, Teresa M. Kirsch, David Leseman, Maurice M. Manown, Kristen K. Gannon, Herman Reynolds, Beverly Davis, Denise L. Swenson, Bryan C. Stranahan, Mary M. Drollinger, Thomas B. Crompe, Linda Humbles, Monique Payan, Jose M. Urquilla, Geary L. Lambert, Bryan A. Kettel, Rachel L. Hueftle, Bobby Roberts, Mary Lou Eastman, Antonio Davis, Thomas R. Phillips, Robert York, Willie F. Gibson, Charles R. Coleman, Terry J. Aufderhaar, Ricky D. Deitch, Helen F. Hollums, Jorge C. Figuerola, Kurt Holmes, Susan Russo, Shelley Smith, Vernita Sherley and Robert P. Hoffman
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International, Safeway, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Grocery Outlet Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, Safeway Health, Inc., The Vons Companies, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Pfizer Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07266
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND CASES TO STATE COURT granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07266-SI; granting (32) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07267-SI; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07268-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07270-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07271-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07272-SI; finding as moot (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07274-SI; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07276-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07277-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (5) Motion to Stay; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07280-SI; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay; granting (26) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07282-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07283-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07287-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07291-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Terry J. Aufderhaar, Reghan Berry, Raymond E. Bonin, Daniel Brunot, Charles R. Coleman, Thomas B. Crompe, Antonio Davis, Beverly Davis, Ricky D. Deitch, Mary M. Drollinger, Mary Lou Eastman, Jorge C. Figuerola, Kristen K. Gannon, Willie F. Gibson, Jonathan M. Hambrick, Robert P. Hoffman, David R. Holland, Helen F. Hollums, Kurt Holmes, Rachel L. Hueftle, Linda Humbles, Bryan A. Kettel, Teresa M. Kirsch, Geary L. Lambert, David Leseman, Maurice M. Manown, Katherine A. Mole, Sandi L. Nagy, Binh Nguyen, Monique Payan, Christopher J. Peterson, Thomas R. Phillips, Breanna M. Post, Colton J. Powell, Antoine Reels, Herman Reynolds, Jana L. Richardson, Bobby Roberts, Susan Russo, Sue Shears, Vernita Sherley, Shelley Smith, Edward L. Stoessel, Bryan C. Stranahan, Denise L. Swenson, Rosalind Tansier, Jose M. Urquilla, John Vance, Marsha Watson, George H. Wtiz, Robert York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Stay ) filed byMaurice M. Manown. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is re quired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 A M in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (43) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 3:20-cv-07266-LB, 3:20-cv-07267-WHA, 3:20-cv-07270-LB, 3:20-cv-07272-SK, 3:20-cv-07274-LB, 3:20-cv-07276-JCS, 3:20-cv-07277-SK, 3:20-cv-07280-SK, 3:20-cv-07291-EMC, 4:20-cv-07268-KAW, 4:20-cv-07271-YGR, 4:20-cv-07282-DMR, 4:20-cv-07283-KAW, 4:20-cv-07287-PJH(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Grocery Outlet Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc., Safeway Health, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, The Vons Companies, Inc. of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent Glaxosmithkline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Defendant Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 re #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #4 MOTION to Stay (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2. (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Alameda County, California. Their case number is RG20073564. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15072719). Filed byPfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B - Notices of Consent from Retailer Defendants)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manown et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Holland
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Tansier
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana L. Richardson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Binh Nguyen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Reels
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reghan Berry
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Watson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton J. Powell
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond E. Bonin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Hambrick
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brunot
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi L. Nagy
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. Stoessel
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine A. Mole
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vance
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna M. Post
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Peterson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Shears
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Wtiz
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Kirsch
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leseman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice M. Manown
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen K. Gannon
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Reynolds
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Davis
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise L. Swenson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan C. Stranahan
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. Drollinger
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas B. Crompe
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Humbles
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Payan
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Urquilla
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geary L. Lambert
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Kettel
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel L. Hueftle
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Roberts
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Eastman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Davis
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Phillips
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert York
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie F. Gibson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Coleman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry J. Aufderhaar
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky D. Deitch
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen F. Hollums
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge C. Figuerola
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Holmes
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Russo
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Smith
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernita Sherley
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Hoffman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?