Kinney et al v. Safeway Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah L Sherrod, Theresa Riddle, Hope Wheelock, Jocelyn Faulkner, Christine McGlasson, Dennis P Barr, Marcella Martinez, Joaquin Carrillo, Amanda P Joseph, Mark G Carnes, Robert L Jackson, Donna L Parker Lopez, David Kinney, Angela M Henkle, Scott A Zwieg, Christopher D Smith, Jesse Roche, Jacoba M Lumbreras, Tracie L Nicholson, Barbara D Seifridsberger, James R Shafer, John C Berry, Susan E Basabe, Douglas Moody, Francis E Garrett, Delores M Crochet, Terri L Statler, Michael Reynolds, Steven P Honer, Ethel M Minor, Anthony C Moseby, Thomas Damon, James R Yates, Heather J Dellin, Danny L Scott, Michael S Cummings, Sandra J Cheek, Mary Laughlin, H. Steven Murphy, Sidney L Oie, Debbie J Costa, Joan M Miller, Adrian A Lopez, Claudia C Stedman, Danny H Dise, Michele M Peters, Robert Marschand, Mark A Mackey, Pennie L Jarrett and Barbara A Birdsley
Defendant: Safeway, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Safeway Health, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Vons Companies, Inc., The, Grocery Outlet, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07271
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND CASES TO STATE COURT granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07266-SI; granting (32) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07267-SI; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07268-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07270-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07271-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07272-SI; finding as moot (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07274-SI; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07276-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07277-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (5) Motion to Stay; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07280-SI; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay; granting (26) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07282-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07283-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07287-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07291-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Dennis P Barr, Susan E Basabe, John C Berry, Barbara A Birdsley, Mark G Carnes, Joaquin Carrillo, Sandra J Cheek, Debbie J Costa, Delores M Crochet, Michael S Cummings, Thomas Damon, Heather J Dellin, Danny H Dise, Jocelyn Faulkner, Francis E Garrett, Angela M Henkle, Steven P Honer, Robert L Jackson, Pennie L Jarrett, Amanda P Joseph, David Kinney, Mary Laughlin, Adrian A Lopez, Jacoba M Lumbreras, Mark A Mackey, Robert Marschand, Marcella Martinez, Christine McGlasson, Joan M Miller, Ethel M Minor, Douglas Moody, Anthony C Moseby, H. Steven Murphy, Tracie L Nicholson, Sidney L Oie, Donna L Parker Lopez, Michele M Peters, Michael Reynolds, Theresa Riddle, Jesse Roche, Danny L Scott, Barbara D Seifridsberger, James R Shafer, Deborah L Sherrod, Christopher D Smith, Terri L Statler, Claudia C Stedman, Hope Wheelock, James R Yates, Scott A Zwieg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Stay ) filed byDavid Kinney. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is re quired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 A M in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 Renotice motion hearing re #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (43) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 3:20-cv-07266-LB, 3:20-cv-07267-WHA, 3:20-cv-07270-LB, 3:20-cv-07272-SK, 3:20-cv-07274-LB, 3:20-cv-07276-JCS, 3:20-cv-07277-SK, 3:20-cv-07280-SK, 3:20-cv-07291-EMC, 4:20-cv-07268-KAW, 4:20-cv-07271-YGR, 4:20-cv-07282-DMR, 4:20-cv-07283-KAW, 4:20-cv-07287-PJH(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/21/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re #6 MOTION to Stay , #1 Notice of Removal, (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing #6 MOTION to Stay set for 12/3/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The briefing schedule remains the same. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020) Modified on 10/19/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Defendant Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3 identifying Corporate Parent Glaxosmithkline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20073641. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15073501). Filed byGlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter parties' names correctly, as, for example, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, should be entered as "Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc." with the text "incorrectly designated as Doe 1" entered in the party text field and NOT as part of the name. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney et al v. Safeway Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L Sherrod
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Riddle
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Wheelock
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Faulkner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine McGlasson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis P Barr
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Martinez
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Carrillo
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda P Joseph
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G Carnes
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Parker Lopez
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kinney
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Henkle
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Zwieg
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D Smith
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Roche
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacoba M Lumbreras
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie L Nicholson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara D Seifridsberger
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Shafer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Berry
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Basabe
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Moody
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis E Garrett
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores M Crochet
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L Statler
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reynolds
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P Honer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M Minor
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony C Moseby
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Damon
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Yates
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather J Dellin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L Scott
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Cummings
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J Cheek
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Laughlin
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Steven Murphy
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney L Oie
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie J Costa
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M Miller
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian A Lopez
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia C Stedman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny H Dise
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele M Peters
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marschand
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Mackey
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennie L Jarrett
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Birdsley
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vons Companies, Inc., The
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?