Bryant et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1 et al
Plaintiff: Shelly Owens, Cosme D. Escamilla, Paul A. Poehling, Betty Harhager, Douglas H. Jarret, John Eric Olstad, Jimmy Bass, Wendy Romero, Khalila Martindale, James Scholten, Lester L. Landgren, Charles Ciambruschini, Gina Gothe, Peter Unpingco, Karen R. Nicholson, Craig E. Groth, Douglas Smith, Lynn E. Long, Patti Shives, Briann C. Appel, Robert B. Freader, Lornell Vanover, Bao Ting Lerner, Beatrice Medeiros, Carolyn Topete, Evelyn Williams, Janice A. Hannaford, Tarra E. Cain, William Mertz, Bradley O. Bryant, Christopher J. Whitman, William Kroger, Zoe A. Bryant, Walter Schirmer, Terry K. Kelley, Richard E. Torgerson, Cherilyn M. Macadam, Patricia Benton, Janet C. Loughmiller, Dennis J. Macleod, Terri L. Boyles, Melvin Wons, Robert M. Kemp, William T. Dahl, Elizabeth C. Lausch, James M. Pearson, Corinne V. Dudschus, Kevin B. Taylor, Sandra J. Bush and Sheryl D. Williams
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1, Grocery Outlet, Kaiser Permanente International, Safeway Health, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6, Safeway, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 3, The Vons Companies, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi US Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07282
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 30 Certified copy of docket sheet and remand order mailed to Alameda County Superior Court (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND CASES TO STATE COURT granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07266-SI; granting (32) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07267-SI; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07268-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07270-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07271-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07272-SI; finding as moot (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07274-SI; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07276-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07277-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (5) Motion to Stay; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07280-SI; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay; granting (26) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07282-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07283-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07287-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07291-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Order re #26 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case by Briann C. Appel, Jimmy Bass, Patricia Benton, Terri L. Boyles, Bradley O. Bryant, Zoe A. Bryant, Sandra J. Bush, Tarra E. Cain, Charles Ciambruschini, William T. Dahl, Corinne V. Dudschus, Cosme D. Escamilla, Robert B. Freader, Gina Gothe, Craig E. Groth, Janice A. Hannaford, Betty Harhager, Douglas H. Jarret, Terry K. Kelley, Robert M. Kemp, William Kroger, Lester L. Landgren, Elizabeth C. Lausch, Bao Ting Lerner, Lynn E. Long, Janet C. Loughmiller, Cherilyn M. Macadam, Dennis J. Macleod, Khalila Martindale, Beatrice Medeiros, William Mertz, Karen R. Nicholson, John Eric Olstad, Shelly Owens, James M. Pearson, Paul A. Poehling, Wendy Romero, Walter Schirmer, James Scholten, Patti Shives, Douglas Smith, Kevin B. Taylor, Carolyn Topete, Richard E. Torgerson, Peter Unpingco, Lornell Vanover, Christopher J. Whitman, Evelyn Williams, Sheryl D. Williams, Melvin Wons. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Briann C. Appel, Jimmy Bass, Patricia Benton, Terri L. Boyles, Bradley O. Bryant, Zoe A. Bryant, Sandra J. Bush, Tarra E. Cain, Charles Ciambruschini, William T. Dahl, Corinne V. Dudschus, Cosme D. Escamilla, Robert B. Freader, Gina Gothe, Craig E. Groth, Janice A. Hannaford, Betty Harhager, Douglas H. Jarret, Terry K. Kelley, Robert M. Kemp, William Kroger, Lester L. Landgren, Elizabeth C. Lausch, Bao Ting Lerner, Lynn E. Long, Janet C. Loughmiller, Cherilyn M. Macadam, Dennis J. Macleod, Khalila Martindale, Beatrice Medeiros, William Mertz, Karen R. Nicholson, John Eric Olstad, Shelly Owens, James M. Pearson, Paul A. Poehling, Wendy Romero, Walter Schirmer, James Scholten, Patti Shives, Douglas Smith, Kevin B. Taylor, Carolyn Topete, Richard E. Torgerson, Peter Unpingco, Lornell Vanover, Christopher J. Whitman, Evelyn Williams, Sheryl D. Williams, Melvin Wons. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byBradley O. Bryant. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is re quired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 A M in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (43) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 3:20-cv-07266-LB, 3:20-cv-07267-WHA, 3:20-cv-07270-LB, 3:20-cv-07272-SK, 3:20-cv-07274-LB, 3:20-cv-07276-JCS, 3:20-cv-07277-SK, 3:20-cv-07280-SK, 3:20-cv-07291-EMC, 4:20-cv-07268-KAW, 4:20-cv-07271-YGR, 4:20-cv-07282-DMR, 4:20-cv-07283-KAW, 4:20-cv-07287-PJH(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Relatedby Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/21/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent Glaxosmithkline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6's motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #16 was renoticed for hearing on a date that is not an available hearing date on Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The 12/11/2020 01:00 PM hearing date is VACATED. Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) Modified on 10/20/2020 (ig, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6's motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #8 was noticed for hearing on a date that is not an available hearing date on Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The 12/8/2020 01:00 PM hearing date is VACATED. Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020).
October 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #7 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6, #6 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Defendant Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6 re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #1 Notice of Removal, (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is RG20073622. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15074447). Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Owens
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosme D. Escamilla
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Poehling
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Harhager
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H. Jarret
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Olstad
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Bass
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Romero
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalila Martindale
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scholten
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester L. Landgren
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ciambruschini
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Gothe
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Unpingco
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen R. Nicholson
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig E. Groth
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Smith
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn E. Long
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Shives
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briann C. Appel
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Freader
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lornell Vanover
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bao Ting Lerner
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Medeiros
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Topete
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Williams
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice A. Hannaford
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarra E. Cain
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mertz
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley O. Bryant
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Whitman
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kroger
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe A. Bryant
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Schirmer
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry K. Kelley
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Torgerson
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherilyn M. Macadam
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Benton
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet C. Loughmiller
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Macleod
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L. Boyles
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Wons
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Kemp
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Dahl
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth C. Lausch
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Pearson
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne V. Dudschus
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin B. Taylor
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Bush
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl D. Williams
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?