Lee et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Donna Sleutskaya, Roberta Afan, Nancy L Frizell, Michael Gardner, Warren G Archer, Cassandra A Brown, Steven E Hanke, James Pon, Christopher Macey, Bertha Sims, Julee Reinsche, Anita G Logg, Paula A Diaz, Kevin Meagher, Christina Barnachia, Trina C Fredenburg, Jeanette Lopez, Wilton J Lee, Richard A Bushway, Sue Buitenhuis, Mark Stephen Adler, Edgar Giron, Wayne Jones, Alan Chancey, Sara J Mangiafico, Catrice Oliver, Renato Guevarra, Lisa L Oberst, Jeffrey Y Ching, David C Lear, Michael Hayes, Ralph J Palmer, Queenie Thomas, Ricardo Guerrero, Hugh C Stackhouse, Thomas S Williams, Rosalyn Queen, Kanita McBride, Kevin W Grosky, Joseph Riggio Jr, Andrew L Harmon Jr, Edgardo J Chavarria, Timothy Adams, Brantley Young, Wayne Freeman, Allen Jones, Kim Matheson, Connie E Sliger-Parker, Eduardo Perez Chaves, William Eskildsen and Britt Gibson Jr
Defendant: Grocery Outlet, Safeway, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, Kaiser Permanente International, DOES 7-100 inclusive, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, The Vons Companies, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv07287
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 Acknowledgement of Receipt from Alameda County Superior Court. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 29 Certified copies of #28 Remand Order and Docket Sheet sent to Alameda County Superior Court. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND CASES TO STATE COURT granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07266-SI; granting (32) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07267-SI; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07268-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07270-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07271-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07272-SI; finding as moot (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07274-SI; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07276-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07277-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (5) Motion to Stay; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07280-SI; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay; granting (26) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07282-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07283-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07287-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07291-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Timothy Adams, Mark Stephen Adler, Roberta Afan, Warren G Archer, Christina Barnachia, Cassandra A Brown, Sue Buitenhuis, Richard A Bushway, Alan Chancey, Edgardo J Chavarria, Jeffrey Y Ching, Paula A Diaz, William Eskildsen, Trina C Fredenburg, Wayne Freeman, Nancy L Frizell, Michael Gardner, Britt Gibson Jr, Edgar Giron, Kevin W Grosky, Ricardo Guerrero, Renato Guevarra, Steven E Hanke, Andrew L Harmon Jr, Michael Hayes, Allen Jones, Wayne Jones, David C Lear, Wilton J Lee, Anita G Logg, Jeanette Lopez, Christopher Macey, Sara J Mangiafico, Kim Matheson, Kanita McBride, Kevin Meagher, Lisa L Oberst, Catrice Oliver, Ralph J Palmer, Eduardo Perez Chaves, James Pon, Rosalyn Queen, Julee Reinsche, Joseph Riggio Jr, Bertha Sims, Donna Sleutskaya, Connie E Sliger-Parker, Hugh C Stackhouse, Queenie Thomas, Thomas S Williams, Brantley Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 25 COMBINED OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) filed by Wilton J Lee. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 10/30/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is re quired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 A M in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (43) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 3:20-cv-07266-LB, 3:20-cv-07267-WHA, 3:20-cv-07270-LB, 3:20-cv-07272-SK, 3:20-cv-07274-LB, 3:20-cv-07276-JCS, 3:20-cv-07277-SK, 3:20-cv-07280-SK, 3:20-cv-07291-EMC, 4:20-cv-07268-KAW, 4:20-cv-07271-YGR, 4:20-cv-07282-DMR, 4:20-cv-07283-KAW, 4:20-cv-07287-PJH(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/21/20. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Safeway, Inc., The Vons Companies, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International and Grocery Outlet, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/21/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re #4 MOTION to Stay , #1 Notice of Removal, (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Defendant Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3 identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20073389. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-15075069). Filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet
Represented By: Sophia Castillo
Represented By: Monica Marie Browner
Represented By: John Clifton McCarron
Represented By: Ashley Boulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Represented By: Moe Keshavarzi
Represented By: Jennifer E. Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 7-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Sleutskaya
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Afan
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy L Frizell
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gardner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren G Archer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra A Brown
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E Hanke
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pon
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Macey
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Sims
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julee Reinsche
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita G Logg
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula A Diaz
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Meagher
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Barnachia
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina C Fredenburg
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Lopez
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton J Lee
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Bushway
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Buitenhuis
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stephen Adler
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Giron
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jones
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Chancey
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara J Mangiafico
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrice Oliver
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato Guevarra
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa L Oberst
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Y Ching
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C Lear
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hayes
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph J Palmer
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queenie Thomas
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Guerrero
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh C Stackhouse
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S Williams
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Queen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanita McBride
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin W Grosky
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Riggio Jr
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L Harmon Jr
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo J Chavarria
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Adams
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brantley Young
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Freeman
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Jones
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Matheson
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie E Sliger-Parker
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Perez Chaves
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Eskildsen
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Gibson Jr
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?