Barros et al v. City & County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Kim Lynch, Brenda Barros, Donna James, Darlene Daevu, Cheryl Thornton, Delfinia Hardy, Jo-Theresa Elias-Jackson and Rachell Evans
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2020cv07358
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 2/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court extends the deadline to file an answer from December 10, 2020, to January 8, 2021. The Court continues the Case Management Conference from January 22, 2021, to February 12, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference DENYING MOTION by Brenda Barros. (Knisbacher, Alden) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference ) Declaration of Angela Alioto filed byBrenda Barros. (Knisbacher, Alden) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference ) filed byBrenda Barros. (Knisbacher, Alden) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Conor Dale in Support of #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference AMENDED Declaration w/Exhibit 1 filed byCity & County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by City & County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Conor Dale, #2 Declaration of Michael Brown, #3 Proposed Order)(Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Conor John Dale , Gina M. Roccanova, Jerel P. Agatep and Kayla M. Rathjen (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Barros (Alioto, Angela) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Barros (Alioto, Angela) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by City & County of San Francisco. (Kimberlin, Kate) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City & County of San Francisco. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brenda Barros.. (Knisbacher, Alden) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15089765.). Filed byDonna James, Jo-Theresa Elias-Jackson, Rachell Evans, Brenda Barros, Delfinia Hardy, Cheryl Thornton, Kim Lynch, Darlene Daevu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Alioto, Angela) (Filed on 10/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barros et al v. City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Lynch
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Barros
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Represented By: Alden Jay Knisbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna James
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Daevu
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Thornton
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfinia Hardy
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo-Theresa Elias-Jackson
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachell Evans
Represented By: Angela M Alioto
Represented By: Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen
Represented By: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Represented By: Jerel Pacis Agatep
Represented By: Kayla Marie Rathjen
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Gina Marie Roccanova
Represented By: Kate G Kimberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?