Pomponio v. Walgreen Co. et al
Plaintiff: Meryl Pomponio
Defendant: Champaign Realty LLC and Walgreen Co. doing business as Walgreen's #01537
Case Number: 3:2020cv07540
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meryl Pomponio. Walgreen Co. served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meryl Pomponio. Champaign Realty LLC served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meryl Pomponio.. (Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Champaign Realty LLC and Walgreen Co.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meryl Pomponio (Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15119425.). Filed byMeryl Pomponio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malakauskas, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomponio v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meryl Pomponio
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champaign Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co. doing business as Walgreen's #01537
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?