State of California et al v. Dhillon et al
Plaintiff: Minnesota Department of Human Rights, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, State of California, Illinois Department of Human Rights, State of Illinois, State of Nevada and State of New Jersey
Defendant: Janet Dhillon and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 3:2020cv07664
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California Proofs of Service (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15264907.) filed by Minnesota Department of Human Rights, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Bell-Munger, Rachel) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15264017.) filed by State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sheehan, Tim) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15253919.) filed by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Heidi) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 09:30 AM by Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/23/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief against Janet Dhillon, U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Filed byState of Maryland, California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, State of California, State of Minnesota, Minnesota Department of Human Rights, State of Illinois, State of New Jersey, Illinois Department of Human Rights, State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, State of California.. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin N Toyama Janette L Wipper on behalf of California Department of Fair Employment and Housing (Toyama, Kaitlin) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Chuang on behalf of the State of California (Chuang, Christine) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Janet Dhillon, and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, INJUNCTIVE, AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against Janet Dhillon, U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15136312.). Filed byState of Minnesota, State of California, State of Maryland, California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, Minnesota Department of Human Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 10/30/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Dhillon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Department of Human Rights
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Bell-Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Bell-Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Department of Fair Employment & Housing
Represented By: Mari NMN Mayeda
Represented By: Kaitlin N. Toyama
Represented By: Panchalam Seshan Srividya
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Janette L Wipper
Represented By: Mari Mayeda
Represented By: Kaitlin N Toyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Panchalam Seshan Srividya
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Christine Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Department of Human Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Tim Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?