Sibley v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher George Sibley and Maria Sibley
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company, EATON CORPORATION individually and sii to Vickers Pump;, VIKING PUMP, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;, Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., BW/IP Inc., General Electric Company, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,, Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Union Carbide Corporation, GARDNER DENVER, INC.;, Crane Co. (individually and successor-in-interest to Cochrane Corporation), Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE CO., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, IMO Industries Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Viacomcbs Inc. and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07697
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Inc for IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey as Lead Trial Counsel, Frederick W. Gatt and Olga G. Pena as Attorneys to be Noticed (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint byIMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eaton Hydraulics LLC identifying Other Affiliate Eaton Corporation plc for Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Murray, Tara) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability; and Jury Demand byEaton Hydraulics LLC. (Murray, Tara) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAir and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Scadden, James) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Crane Co., Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 63 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint byTriple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. for Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Keith Bernard on behalf of DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/21/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Anne McClain (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Jenkins, Jr (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by GARDNER DENVER, INC. identifying Corporate Parent KKR & Co. Inc., Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand, Inc. for GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 49 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Electric Company.. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION for FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 42 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint byFOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Ann Smith (Smith, Deborah) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUnion Carbide Corporation. (Smith, Deborah) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS for SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC... (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 35 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint for Asbestos Personal Injury/Product Liability by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Shaffer for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation (Gaye, Samlecia) (Filed on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent Warren Pumps, LLC, Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries for Warren Pumps LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability by Carrier Corporation. (Gaye, Samlecia) (Filed on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability byWarren Pumps LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint byRockwell Automation, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond for Defendant Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham for Defendant Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,, TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT EATON HYDRAULICS LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by EATON HYDRAULICS LLC. (Murray, Tara) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Ann Murray (Murray, Tara) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 14, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 ASSOCIATION of Counsel re: Medical and Employment Discovery by J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc... (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanthara Meak (Meak, Vanthara) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Ridley (Ridley, Shawn) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #12 Notice of Appearance filed by Eaton Corporation (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Eaton Corporation (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Terra Millennium Corporation, Other Affiliate RiverStone, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Co./Allianz/Enstar, Other Affiliate Resolute Management for J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation. (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane B Yee Notice of Appearance by Vanthara Meak (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 Incorrect event used please disregard document. See revised document at Docket No. #13 . Statement RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eaton Corporation. (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane B Yee Notice of Appearance by Shawn M. Ridley (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane B Yee (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation. (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher George Sibley, Maria Sibley.. (Friedman, Ari) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co. (individually and successor-in-interest to Cochrane Corporation), EATON CORPORATION individually and sii to Vickers Pump;, Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;, GARDNER DENVER, INC.;, General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE CO., J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, VIKING PUMP, INC., Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Warren Pumps LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Ari) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability against Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co. (individually and successor-in-interest to Cochrane Corporation), EATON CORPORATION individually and sii to Vickers Pump;, Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;, GARDNER DENVER, INC.;, General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE CO., J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, VIKING PUMP, INC., Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Warren Pumps LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15142057.). Filed byChristopher George Sibley, Maria Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Ari) (Filed on 11/2/2020) Modified on 11/3/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sibley v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher George Sibley
Represented By: Ari Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sibley
Represented By: Ari Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION individually and sii to Vickers Pump;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Ann Smith
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. (individually and successor-in-interest to Cochrane Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Lois Hawkins
Represented By: Randall Keith Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Samlecia D Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Wetherill Wood
Represented By: Evanthia M. Spanos
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Laura Przetak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest, parent, alter ego and equitable trustee of DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Vanthara Meak
Represented By: Shawn Michael Ridley
Represented By: Jane B Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics LLC
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Tara Ann Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?