Pangea Legal Services et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Dolores Street Community Services and Pangea Legal Services
Defendant: Mark A Morgan, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Tony H. Pham, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf, James McHenry and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Petitioner: Immigration Equality
Amicus Curiae: Immigration Legal Services Organizations and Immigration Law Professors
Case Number: 3:2020cv07721
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER of USCA as to #90 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William P. Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Tony H. Pham (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 96 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE pursuant to ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STAY #95 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STAY denying #91 Motion to Stay; granting #92 Motion to Shorten Time; granting #93 Motion to Stay. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 94 USCA Case Number 20-17490 for #90 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William P. Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Tony H. Pham. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 93 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/6/2021. Replies due by 1/13/2021. (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 92 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time for Decision on Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 91 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #74 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/6/2021. Replies due by 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Jill W. Anderson, #2 Exhibit B, Declaration of Andrew Davidson)(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. Appeal of Order #74 , Order on Motion for TRO #69 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO RELATE denying #84 Motion to Relate Case; denying #85 Administrative Motion. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services re #84 MOTION to Relate Case (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 87 REPLY (re #84 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #85 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Determination of Related Cases Under Civil L.R. 3-12, #84 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byWilliam P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 85 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED UNDER CIVIL L.R. 3-12. [Civil L.R. 7-11] filed by Immigration Equality. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer C. Pizer in Support of Immigration Equality's Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Pizer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Pizer Declaration, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Under Civil L.R. 3-12, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Manes, Austin) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 84 DMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Naomi A. Igra In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 83 Transcript of REMOTE ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE Proceedings held on 11/18/2020, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #72 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2021. (Related documents(s) #72 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 82 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 02:30 PM - Telephonic Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. (Related documents(s) #81 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #80 Stipulation to Extend Time and Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 02:30 PM - Telephonic Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Adam Pie.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 78 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Adam Pie's Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15252092.) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Pie, Adam) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Scordino.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 76 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 11:00 AM - Telephonic Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2020.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. (Related documents(s) #74 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 75 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ellen Scordino's Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15239988.) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Admission and Good Standing)(Scordino, Ellen) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2020 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CONVERTING TRO TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 73 Joint Statement re #69 Order on Motion for TRO concerning further briefing, if any by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/23/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2020 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2020 before Judge Susan Illston by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 70 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appea rance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 2, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/9/2020 02:00 PM. (Related documents(s) #69 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #21 Motion for TRO. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/18/2020 before Judge Susan Illston regarding Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order. Hearing held. Motion taken under submission. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY (re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Naomi Igra, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Cameron Fine.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE re #62 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Cameron Fine) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15189429.) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fine, Cameron) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Stewart (Stewart, Scott) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #21 . Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties w ho wish to be identified by the court who will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 16, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST. The Court is requesting that only persons making arguments during the hearing register.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR AMICI TO FILE BRIEFS; GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY granting #53 Motion for Leave to File; granting #56 Motion for Leave to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Shoba Sivaprasad Wadhia.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Peter Margulies.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf concerning other cases (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf OF FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EOIR Certification, #2 Exhibit DHS Certification, #3 Exhibit Record (Part 1), #4 Exhibit Record (Part 2), #5 Exhibit Record (Part 3), #6 Exhibit Record (Part 4), #7 Exhibit Record (Part 5), #8 Exhibit Record (Part 6), #9 Exhibit Record (Part 7), #10 Exhibit Record (Part 8), #11 Exhibit Record (Part 9), #12 Exhibit Record (Part 10), #13 Exhibit Record (Part 11))(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byWilliam P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Immigration Professors as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Shoba Sivaprasad Wadhia ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15177186.) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service MD Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service NJ Certificate of Good Standing)(Wadhia, Shoba) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Immigration Legal Services Organizations (Fleming, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Immigration Legal Services Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fleming, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Peter Margulies) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15177067.) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Margulies, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Anderson Fleming (Fleming, Joel) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Philip L. Torrey.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sabrineh Ardalan.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 48 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Susan Marie Krumplitsch on behalf of Immigration Law Professors. (Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15176445.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Torrey, Philip) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15176385.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Ardalan, Sabrineh) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Newell, Jr (Newell, Craig) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jack W. Pirozzolo.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services re 25 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing.,,,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #22 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #24 Order, #37 Renotice motion hearing, And Other New Case Documents (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services re #1 Complaint, #19 Summons Issued as to USA, and Other New Case Documents (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15162227.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Pirozzolo, Jack) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Sameer Ahmed (Ahmed, Sameer) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kenyon Hall.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Cristina Velez.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 37 Renotice motion hearing re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Notice of Court's Order And Notice of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, And Stay, And Memorandum Of Points and Authorities In Support filed byCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 36 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Corrected motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15145027.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/02/2020 filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Velez, Cristina) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15157868.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Hall, Kenyon) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Chike Croslin.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144261.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/2/2020 filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Croslin, Chike) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Tobias S. Loss-Eaton.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sirine Shebaya.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Nabilah Siddiquee.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Leila Kang.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Alice A. Wang.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez R. Reuveni (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina P Greer (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM. Opposition due by 11/10/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 16, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 Order, #21 MOTION for T emporary Restraining Order . Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/18/2020 11:00 AM. Responses due by 11/10/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is Motion for Pro Hac Vice, NOT Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. [err101]This filing will not be process ed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #17 MOTION filed by Dolores Street Community Services, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SETTING FURTHER DATES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Susan Illston denying #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Chike Croslin, the bar number on the Pro Hac Vice Application does not match any attorney admitted to this district. Please resubmit a corrected Motion for Pro Hac Vice. No additional payments needed, please use the original receipt number for Motion #10 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/4/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate Regarding Notice to Defendants of Ex Parte Motion, #5 Exhibit A (Declaration of Etan Newman), #6 Exhibit B (Declaration of Katherine Mahoney), #7 Exhibit C (Declaration of Michelle N. Mendez), #8 Exhibit D (Declaration of Claudia Cubas), #9 Declaration Naomi Igra, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Mark A Morgan, Tony H. Pham, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf.(mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15145027.) Corrected #15 motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed byCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Velez, Cristina) (Filed on 11/3/2020) Modified on 11/3/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/5/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Corrected motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144642.) Filing fee previously paid on November 2, 2020 filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is the MOTION category. Renotice motion hearing is an event only for renoticing a hearing date. [err101]C orrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #17 Renotice motion hearing re #15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Dolores Street Community Services, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Pangea Legal Services. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #17 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15145027.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Velez, Cristina) (Filed on 11/2/2020) Modified on 11/3/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15145030.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Kang, Leila) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services.. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144868.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Siddiquee, Nabilah) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144642.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144261.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Croslin, Chike) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144207.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Loss-Eaton, Tobias) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15144096.) filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Wang, Alice) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dolores Street Community Services (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pangea Legal Services (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief And Administrative Procedure Act Case against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15143536.). Filed byCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Dolores Street Community Services, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 11/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangea Legal Services et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Morgan
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony H. Pham
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Craig Alan Newell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Nabilah Siddiquee
Represented By: Cristina M Velez
Represented By: Chike Bascom Waugh Croslin
Represented By: Alice A. Wang
Represented By: Tobias Loss-Eaton
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Jack Woodruff Pirozzolo
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Kenyon Colli Hall
Represented By: Philip L Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Nabilah Siddiquee
Represented By: Cristina M Velez
Represented By: Chike Bascom Waugh Croslin
Represented By: Alice A. Wang
Represented By: Tobias Loss-Eaton
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Jack Woodruff Pirozzolo
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Kenyon Colli Hall
Represented By: Philip L Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Street Community Services
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Nabilah Siddiquee
Represented By: Cristina M Velez
Represented By: Chike Bascom Waugh Croslin
Represented By: Alice A. Wang
Represented By: Tobias Loss-Eaton
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Jack Woodruff Pirozzolo
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Kenyon Colli Hall
Represented By: Philip L Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pangea Legal Services
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Nabilah Siddiquee
Represented By: Cristina M Velez
Represented By: Chike Bascom Waugh Croslin
Represented By: Alice A. Wang
Represented By: Tobias Loss-Eaton
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Sabrineh Ardalan
Represented By: Jack Woodruff Pirozzolo
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Kenyon Colli Hall
Represented By: Philip L Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Immigration Equality
Represented By: Austin W Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Legal Services Organizations
Represented By: Joel Anderson Fleming
Represented By: Lauren Godles Milgroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Law Professors
Represented By: Peter Simon Margulies
Represented By: Adam James Pie
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Represented By: Shoba Wadhia
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Represented By: Ellen Scordino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?