Zajonc et al v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Plaintiff: Pranko Lozano, Danyael Williams and Jason Zajonc
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07871
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Request to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and [Proposed] Order) filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Adam Lauridsen in Support)(Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2021 is continued to 2/18/2021 at 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Electronic Arts Inc. (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons) (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Arts Inc... (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor L Reeves (Reeves, Taylor) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Justin Rosen (Rosen, David) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adam Lauridsen (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by R. James Slaughter (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Zajonc, Pranko Lozano, Danyael Williams. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Fitzgerald, Jack) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pranko Lozano, Danyael Williams, Jason Zajonc.. (Fitzgerald, Jack) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Rae Persinger (Persinger, Melanie) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Matthew Flynn (Flynn, Trevor) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fitzgerald, Jack) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Electronic Arts Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15169884.). Filed byJason Zajonc, Pranko Lozano, Danyael Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CLRA Venue Affidavit)(Fitzgerald, Jack) (Filed on 11/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zajonc et al v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pranko Lozano
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyael Williams
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Zajonc
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: David Justin Rosen
Represented By: Robert Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Taylor L Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?