Horton v. Altria Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Horton
Defendant: Altria Group Inc., Juul Labs Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc., Pax Labs Inc, Chevron Corporation, Altria Group Distribution, Nicholas Pritzker, Circle K Stores, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc, Hoyoung Huh, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Walmart, eLiquitech, Inc., Juul Labs Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as Ploom Inc., Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Riaz Valani, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Walgreens Boots, James Monsees, 7-Eleven, Inc., Altria Enterprises, McLane Company, Inc. and Speedway LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv08510
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #33 Summons Returned Executed filed by Scott Horton, #34 Summons Returned Executed filed by Scott Horton, #32 Summons Returned Executed filed by Scott Horton. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer should enter in the text the name of the defendant being served. Re: #13 - #31 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Scott Horton. (mc lS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/12/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/12/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/12/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2021 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises, Altria Group Distribution, Altria Group Inc., Adam Bowen, Chevron Corporation, Circle K Stores, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walmart, eLiquitech, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra M. Gill. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra Milan Gill, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15306595) filed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PERSONAL INJURY) against Altria Group Inc., Juul Labs Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution, Altria Enterprises, James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Nicholas Pritzker, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Tobacco Technology, Inc., eLiquitech, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc, Chevron Corporation, Circle K Stores, Inc., Speedway LLC, 7-Eleven, Inc., Walmart. Filed by Scott Horton. (Gill, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 2, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Massachusetts, 1:20-cv-11994, Horton v. Altria Group, Inc. et al., Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-8510-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #5 CTO-48 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-11994. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 11/23/2020. (Currie, Haley)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 48 in MDL Case 2913 received from Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Currie, Haley)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 48 in MDL Case 2913 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Scott Horton individually and on behalf of his minor son, J.H. against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8498274 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Scott Horton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45 Form JS 45)(Gill, Alexandra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2020) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Altria Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pax Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eLiquitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as Ploom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Horton
Represented By: Alexandra Milan Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?