Messinger et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Messinger, Joseph Cianci, Irving S. Braun, Varghese Pallathu, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa, Gerald Ashford, Johnny Ramey and Judith Braun
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Ryan Graves, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Garrett Camp, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Canaccord Genuity, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Ronald Sugar, Barclays Capital Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., David Trujillo, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Allen & Company LLC, JMP Securities LLC, BTIG, LLC, Dara Khosrowshahi, Glen Ceremony, Academy Securities, Inc., TPG Capital BD, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Arianna Huffington, Matt Cohler, Nelson Chai, John Thain, Wan Ling Martello, H.E. Yasir Al-Rumayyan, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Evercore Group L.L.C., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Ursula Burns, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Cowen and Company, LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Needham & Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv08610
Filed: December 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by William Blair & Company, L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by TPG Capital BD, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by RBC Capital Markets, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Needham & Company, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Mizuho Securities USA LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Mischler Financial Group, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Loop Capital Markets LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by JMP Securities LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Evercore Group L.L.C. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Cowen and Company, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Castleoak Securities, L.P. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Canaccord Genuity, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by BTIG, LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Barclays Capital Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Allen & Company LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Academy Securities, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASES 3:19-cv-06361 RS and 3:20-cv-08610 WHA. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Uber Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by David Trujillo waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by John Thain waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Ronald Sugar waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Wan Ling Martello waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Travis Kalanick waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Arianna Huffington waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Ryan Graves waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Ursula Burns waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Dara Khosrowshahi waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Matt Cohler waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Nelson Chai waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Glen Ceremony waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. Service waived by Garrett Camp waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis V. Trinko (Trinko, Curtis) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Rosen (Rosen, Henry) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Sanchez (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Bierl Polychron (Polychron, Sara) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Ian Jaconette (Jaconette, James) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 5, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint,,,,, filed byGerald Ashford, Irving S. Braun, Judith Braun, Joseph Cianci, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Johnny Ramey. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 12/5/2020)
December 5, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gerald Ashford, Irving S. Braun, Judith Braun, Joseph Cianci, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Johnny Ramey re #1 Complaint,,,,, (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 12/5/2020)
December 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Academy Securities, Inc., H.E. Yasir Al-Rumayyan, Allen & Company LLC, BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Ursula Burns, Garrett Camp, Canaccord Genuity, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Glen Ceremony, Nelson Chai, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Matt Cohler, Cowen and Company, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Ryan Graves, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Arianna Huffington, JMP Securities LLC, Travis Kalanick, Dara Khosrowshahi, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Wan Ling Martello, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Needham & Company, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Ronald Sugar, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., TPG Capital BD, LLC, John Thain, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., David Trujillo, Uber Technologies, Inc., William Blair & Company, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15279675.). Filed byJoseph Cianci, Gerald Ashford, David Messinger, Varghese Pallathu, Irving S. Braun, Johnny Ramey, Judith Braun, Ellie Marie Toronto Esa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 12/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messinger et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kalanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Khosrowshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Ceremony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Capital BD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arianna Huffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Cohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Chai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wan Ling Martello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E. Yasir Al-Rumayyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mischler Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Needham & Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Messinger
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cianci
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving S. Braun
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Sara Bierl Polychron
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Henry Rosen
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varghese Pallathu
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellie Marie Toronto Esa
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Ashford
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Sara Bierl Polychron
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Henry Rosen
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ramey
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Braun
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: William C. Fredericks
Represented By: Sara Bierl Polychron
Represented By: Marion Curry Passmore
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Curtis V. Trinko
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Henry Rosen
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: W. Scott Holleman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?