Hufnus v. DoNotPay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mathew Hufnus
Defendant: DoNotPay, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE")
Case Number: 3:2020cv08701
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 54 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2021. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria terminating #22 Stipulation re motion to dismiss deadlines; granting #30 Motion to Dismiss. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE by Mathew Hufnus re #32 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Williams v. Schanck)(Hiraldo, Manuel) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 51 Statement re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Statement of Recent Decision by DoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klausner, Tonia) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 50 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMathew Hufnus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Atkinson v. Pro Custom Solar)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Mathew Hufnus re #32 Opposition/Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Carl v. First Natl Bank of Omaha)(Hiraldo, Manuel) (Filed on 6/16/2021) Modified on 6/16/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2021 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2021. The Court will reset the matter if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Koster.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 46 Statement re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Statement of Recent Decision by DoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klausner, Tonia) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Karl Koster) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 34611154776.) Filing fee paid on 6/10/21, filed by Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE"). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the motion hearing set for 6/10/2021, re #30 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 43 Statement re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Statement of Recent Decision by DoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klausner, Tonia) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Sigall.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin A. Sigall ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16038487.) filed by Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE"). (Sigall, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE re #34 Amicus Curiae Appearance, #35 Amicus Curiae Brief by Mathew Hufnus. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 6/2/2021) Modified on 6/2/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michele Shuster. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Manuel Hiraldo. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16028121.) filed by Mathew Hufnus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Litvak, William) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16027138.) filed by Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE"). (Shuster, Michele) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 35 Amicus Curiae BRIEF entered by Andrew Daniel Bluth on behalf of Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE"). (Bluth, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2021 Filing 34 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Andrew Daniel Bluth on behalf of Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE"). (Bluth, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY (re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byDoNotPay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byMathew Hufnus. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 31 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2021, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Galvan Colin, telephone number 408-888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #29 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #29 ) (ggc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by DoNotPay, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/19/2021. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (Klausner, Tonia) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/28/2021 before Judge Vince Chhabria by DoNotPay, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021: Corrected hearing date. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 4/28/2021.Discovery is stayed until after the resolution of the impending motion to dismiss.Motion to Dismiss due to be filed by 5/5/2021.Motion Hearing re Motion to Dismiss set for 6/10/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria.Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days prior to the hearings.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:22 - 2:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Ignacio Hiraldo. Defendant Attorney: Sara Tolbert and Tonia Klausner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 : Matter transcribed by Gina Colin. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Klausner.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBITS re #15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tonia Ouellette Klausner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15413942.) Certificate of Good Standing for Tonia Ouellette Klausner filed byDoNotPay, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #22 stipulation for extension of deadlines. The deadline to respond to the amended complaint will be extended, but the Court will discuss scheduling with the parties at Wednesday's case management conference. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/26/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR 4/28/2021 CMC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advance d notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 22, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. ( This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mathew Hufnus. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #21 Amended Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Deadlines for Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by DoNotPay, Inc.. (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DoNotPay, Inc.. Filed byMathew Hufnus. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/5/2021. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by DoNotPay, Inc. re #18 Order on Motion to Stay Joint Notice of Supreme Court Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #16 Motion to Stay. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 Statement of Non-Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay filed byMathew Hufnus. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay filed by DoNotPay, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 2/2/2021. Replies due by 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tonia Ouellette Klausner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15413942.) filed by DoNotPay, Inc.. (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by DoNotPay, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Coatue Management, LLC, Other Affiliate AH Capital Management, LLC for DoNotPay, Inc.. (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lai-Ming Rose Tolbert (Tolbert, Sara) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2021, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 24, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mathew Hufnus. Service waived by DoNotPay, Inc. waiver sent on 12/24/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mathew Hufnus.. (Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ignacio Javier Hiraldo. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15312996.) filed by Mathew Hufnus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hiraldo, Ignacio) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DoNotPay, Inc. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Litvak, William) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act, 47 U.S.C 227, Et Seq. (TCPA) against DoNotPay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15294056.). Filed byMathew Hufnus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Litvak, William) (Filed on 12/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hufnus v. DoNotPay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoNotPay, Inc.
Represented By: Tonia Ouellette Klausner
Represented By: Sara Lai-Ming Rose Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Hufnus
Represented By: William Litvak
Represented By: Ignacio Javier Hiraldo
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professional Association for Customer Engagement ("PACE")
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Bluth
Represented By: Benjamin A. Sigall
Represented By: Karl Koster
Represented By: Michele Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?