Lopez v National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Lucille Carole Lopez
Defendant: Amtrak National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv09225
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Damages against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Filed byLucille Carole Lopez. (Panagotacos, Constantine) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Amtrak's Time to Respond to Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Defendant Amtrak's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Castillo, Vincent) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lucille Carole Lopez.. (Cody, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Cody, Matthew) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Blank Summons filed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please fill out document and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Lucille Carole Lopez (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Lucille Carole Lopez Certificate of Interested Parties (Cody, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2020) Modified on 12/21/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cody, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Amtrak National Railroad Passenger Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15342711.). Filed byLucille Carole Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cody, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Vincent Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Carole Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Reid Cody
Represented By: Constantine Milton Panagotacos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?