Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, McKesson Corporation, Liberty Special Markets Agency, AIU Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Argo RE Limited, Markel American Insurance Company, Does 1-50, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED, XL Insurance America, Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Swiss RE International SE, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. and Arch Reinsurance Limited
Case Number: 3:2020cv09356
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by McKesson Corporation, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 2/25/2021 re #90 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The motion was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)(Time 00:44)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Rick Endres, Michael Shuster, Daniel Sullivan, and Gregory DubinskyAttorneys for Defendant McKesson Corporation: Gretchen Hoff Varner, Nathan Shafroth, and Anna EnghAttorneys for Defendants AIU Insurance Co. and National Union: Christopher St. Jeanos, Jocelyn Sher, Madeleine McKennaAttorney for Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company: Jessica Do (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Frances McKenna for Defendants AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 125 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identifi ed by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 2/24/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah m, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 124 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Joint filed by GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 123 Response re #122 Order byAce Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing reset for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE: DISMISSED DEFENDANTS AND REMAND MOTION HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/16/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' APPEARANCES AND CONSENT AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/12/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 120 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Please take notice the case management conference set for March 22, 2021 is continued to March 25, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Joint case management conference statement shall be filed by March 18, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 119 STIPULATION re Complaint,,,,, JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Do, Jessica) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 118 ANSWER to Counterclaim byAce Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 117 REPLY (re #90 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAce Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (59) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Horowitz in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC; granting (114) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Horowitz in case 3:20-cv-09356-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 115 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA byMcKesson Corporation. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Horowitz ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15486963.) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Horowitz, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #90 is reset for February 25, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. Please also note that the Court cannot rule on any dispositive motion without consent of all parties. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Lloyd's London Defendants by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Sullivan, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (49) Administrative Motion to Relate. 20-9356 DMR is related to this action. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #108 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 109 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED.. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 108 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Golden State Insurance Company Limited shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 106 STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO/SUPPORT FOR #90 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of ANDREW L. MARGULIS)(Do, Jessica) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 105 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 104 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company.. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 103 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 102 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 101 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company.. (Do, Jessica) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 100 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 1/11/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #96 Jocelyn M. Sher's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #95 Christopher J. St. Jeanos's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #94 Mitchell Jay Auslander's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 96 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Jocelyn Mara Sher as Counsel for AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15418891) filed by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Sher, Jocelyn) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Christopher J. St. Jeanos as Counsel for AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15418870) filed by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (St. Jeanos, Christopher) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Mitchell Jay Auslander as Counsel for AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15418820) filed by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Auslander, Mitchell) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2021 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company byNational Union Fire Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #86 Answer to to CrossClaim, Counterclaim, #89 Certificate of Interested Entities by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 90 MOTION to Remand filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 1/19/2021. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A - McKesson 10Q, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., for AIU Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #84 Gregory Jabob Dubinsky's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #81 Denisha S. Bacchus's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 86 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM against McKesson Corporation by National Union Fire Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 1/4/2021) Modified on 1/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2021 Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE re #68 : Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), parties may stipulate to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint without a court order provided the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Dubinsky ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15392160.) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dubinsky, Gregory) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 83 ANSWER to Counterclaim byAce Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Lexington Insurance Company Pursuant To Rule 41(A)(1)(A)(I) by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Denisha S. Bacchus (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15382407) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bacchus, Denisha) (Filed on 12/30/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2020 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Sullivan, Daniel) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1500017 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #61 James M. McGuire's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #60 Blair E. Kaminsky's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #59 Daniel Martin Sullivan's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #58 Michael S. Shuster's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Extension for Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company to Respond to the Complaint filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Do, Jessica) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. No title page with this court's case caption. Affidavits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Loc al Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #62 through #67 Affidavits of Service, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 67 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 66 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1500017 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 65 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 64 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 63 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 62 ***ERROR MESSAGE SENT, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons with Orders Setting Setting Scheduling Conference, Defendant Mckesson Corporation's Notice of Removal, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610 on 12/24/2020, filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Endres, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: James M. McGuire (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15375391) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Blair E. Kaminsky (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15375370) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaminsky, Blair) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Daniel M. Sullivan (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15375333) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sullivan, Daniel) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael S. Shuster (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15375303) filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2020 Filing 57 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from Central District of California, 8:20cv02268-DOC-DFM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2020 Filing 55 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:20-cv-02268. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 12/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2020 Filing 54 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter (twdb)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS ORDERED: 1. ACE consents to McKessons pending motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. Case electronically sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated #21 #2 . (twdb)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #51 Non-Resident Attorney David A. Suttinger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of McKesson Corporation, Defendant, designating Raymond G. Lu as local counsel. (twdb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 51 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Luttinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation, Counter Claimant McKesson Corporation, Cross Claimant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29655011) filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lu, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 50 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Norther District of California filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Endres, Richard)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Clea P.M. Liquard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation, designating Raymond G. Lu as local counsel #46 . (gk)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, designating Richard S. Endres as local counsel #33 . (gk)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, designating Richard S. Endres as local counsel #37 . (gk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clea P.M. Liquard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29535607) filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lu, Raymond)
December 15, 2020 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation, re Notice (Other) #15 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #26 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 12/8/2020, Receipt No. 29409583) #20 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29409583) #16 , Notice of Appearance #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #2 , Notice (Other), #1 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, #27 (upon National Fire & Marine Insurance Company) served on 12/10/2020. (Shafroth, Nathan)
December 14, 2020 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #26 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 12/8/2020, Receipt No. 29409583) #20 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #25 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29409583) #16 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #2 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, #27 served on December 11, 2020. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen)
December 14, 2020 Filing 43 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby STRIKES the Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021. This entry is a duplicate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney James M. McGuire APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff, designating Richard S. Endres as local counsel. (twdb)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff, designating Richard S. Endres as local counsel. (twdb)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Shuster APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff, designating Richard S. Endres as local counsel. (twdb)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of McKesson Corporaton Defendant, designating Raymond G. Lu as local counsel. Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of McKesson Corporaton Defendant, designating Raymond G. Lu as local counsel. (twdb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Daniel M. Horowitz on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 11, 2020 Filing 37 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 12/10/2020, Receipt No. 29462997) filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Endres, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29462997) #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ missing. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 10, 2020 Filing 35 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29467194) filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Attorney James M. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Endres, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 [STRICKEN] ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) Modified on 12/14/2020 (kd).
December 10, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29463198) filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Endres, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Filing 32 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) as to defendants AIU Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (twdb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29462997) filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Application for Attorney Blair E. Kaminsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Endres, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Shuster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29456485) filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Attorney Michael S. Shuster to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Endres, Richard)
December 9, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against National Union Fire Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, and Cross-claim Plaintiff McKesson Corporation.(Hoff Varner, Gretchen)
December 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, identifying McKesson Corporation. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen)
December 9, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Adding Gretchen A. Hoff Varner as counsel of record for McKesson Corproation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attorney Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Hoff Varner, Gretchen)
December 9, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment 1 to Summons to Complaint - Additional Defendants, #2 Supplement Attachment 2 to Summons to Complaint - Defendants to Be Served)(Endres, Richard)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division filed by defendant McKesson Corporation set for January 11, 2021, 8:30 a.m. (Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/10/2020 (kd).
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 12/8/2020, Receipt No. 29409583) filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lu, Raymond)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29409583) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Application needs to be flattened. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Raymond Gin Lu on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Lu, Raymond)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Raymond Gin Lu on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Lu, Raymond)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anna P. Engh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant McKesson Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29409583) filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Attorney Raymond Gin Lu added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Lu, Raymond)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clea P.M. Liquard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David Luttinger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anna Engh. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Horowtiz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blair E Kaminsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M McGuire. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Shuster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Spiro K Bantis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
December 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIU Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Limited, Argo RE Limited, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Does, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Special Markets Agency, Markel American Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, XL Insurance America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (filed in state court 11/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Evans Shafroth
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner
Represented By: Anna P Engh
Represented By: David A Luttinger
Represented By: Clea P.M. Liquard
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Special Markets Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIU Insurance Company
Represented By: Mitchell Auslander
Represented By: Christopher St. Jeanos
Represented By: Madeleine Frances McKenna
Represented By: Jocelyn M Sher
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Capacity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Company SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo RE Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Mitchell Auslander
Represented By: Christopher St. Jeanos
Represented By: Madeleine Frances McKenna
Represented By: Jocelyn M Sher
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss RE International SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Reinsurance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick G Bollig
Represented By: Blair E. Kaminsky
Represented By: Michael S. Shuster
Represented By: Daniel M. Sullivan
Represented By: James Maurice McGuire, I
Represented By: Richard S Endres
Represented By: Richard Stephen Endres
Represented By: Blair Eden Kaminsky
Represented By: Gregory J Dubinsky
Represented By: Daniel Martin Sullivan
Represented By: James M. McGuire
Represented By: Denisha Simone Bacchus
Represented By: Daniel Marc Horowitz
Represented By: Michael Steven Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?