Carnegie Mellon University v. LSI Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carnegie Mellon University
Defendant: Aleksandar Kavcic, Avago Technologies U.S. Inc and LSI Corporation
Interested Party: Marvell Semiconductor Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020mc80121
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-04571-JD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/23/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00664. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Quash or Modify Third Party Subpoena Dkt. #1 is HEREBY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the NorthernDistrict of California, San Francisco Division. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of agreement of parties to transfer to NDCal by Aleksandar Kavcic re #1 MOTION to Quash (Cramer, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2020 re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Aleksandar Kavcic (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold-ERO.)(cj)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion Hearing set, by telephone, for 7/15/2020 02:00 PM re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Aleksandar Kavcic before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Aleksandar Kavcic, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Respondent Aleksandar Kavcic (Griffin, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William D. Cramer for Aleksandar Kavcic,William D. Cramer for Aleksandar Kavcic. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., LSI Corporation, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Respondent Aleksandar Kavcic (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Mills, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Proposed Order)(Mills, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey D. Mills on behalf of Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., LSI Corporation. Attorney Jeffrey D. Mills added to party Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey D. Mills added to party LSI Corporation(pty:dft) (Mills, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin.. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that this motion is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Andrew Austin for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aleksandar Kavcic #1 MOTION to Quash (Griffin, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth F. Griffin for William D. Cramer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13701301) by on behalf of Aleksandar Kavcic. (Griffin, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
June 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash (Receipt #100038714 Filing Fee $47.00) by Aleksandar Kavcic. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, Receipt, and Envelope, #8 Proposed Order)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnegie Mellon University v. LSI Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnegie Mellon University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksandar Kavcic
Represented By: William D. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies U.S. Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marvell Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?