Mooney v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Mooney
Defendant: Dayton Misfeldt, Steve R. Carchedi, David C. Stump, Steven B. Ketchum, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Home L. Pearce, James W. Young, H. Ward Wolff and Nicole Onetto
Case Number: 3:2021cv00182
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Mooney (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Mooney. Service waived by Viracta Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Dayton Misfeldt, Nicole Onetto, Home L. Pearce, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., H. Ward Wolff, James W. Young. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by James Mooney Amended Cover Sheet. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by James Mooney (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Mooney (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve R. Carchedi, Steven B. Ketchum, Dayton Misfeldt, Nicole Onetto, Home L. Pearce, Sol Merger Sub, Inc., David C. Stump, Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viracta Therapeutics, Inc., H. Ward Wolff, James W. Young (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15418730). Filed by James Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/11/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 7/19) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:[1-2] Complaint's Civil Cover Sheet, filed by James Mooney. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney v. Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Misfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve R. Carchedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Ketchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Merger Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viracta Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home L. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ward Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Onetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mooney
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan Paul Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?