Silver v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Silver
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, GDCV Residential Portfolio, L.P., GDCV Market Street 87, LLC, Greystar Worldwide, LLC and Greystar California, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00698
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A. Perez NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Perez, Michelle) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC, GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P., GREYSTAR WORLDWIDE, LLC AND GDCV RESIDENTIAL PORTFOLIO, L.P. WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by GDCV Market Street 87, LLC, Greystar California, Inc.. (Brumfiel, Christopher) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Easton Brumfiel APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Brumfiel, Christopher) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aimee Silver (Coyle, Devin) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by GDCV Market Street 87, LLC, Greystar California, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Greystar California, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate GDCV Market Street 87, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate GDCV Residential Portfolio, LP, a Delaware Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate GDCV Pasadena 173, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate GDCV PASADENA 201, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate GDCV CULVER CITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company for GDCV Market Street 87, LLC; Corporate Parent Greystar Management Services, LP, a Delaware Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Greystar California, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Greystar California, Inc.. (Brumfiel, Christopher) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGDCV Market Street 87, LLC, Greystar California, Inc.. (Brumfiel, Christopher) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aimee Silver (Coyle, Devin) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 17, 16th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GDCV Market Street 87, LLC, GDCV Residential Portfolio, L.P., Greystar California, Inc., Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Greystar Worldwide, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15507288.). Filed byAimee Silver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Coyle, Devin) (Filed on 1/28/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDCV Residential Portfolio, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDCV Market Street 87, LLC
Represented By: Michelle A. Perez
Represented By: Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar California, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle A. Perez
Represented By: Christopher Easton Brumfiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Silver
Represented By: Devin Cannell Coyle
Represented By: Stephanie J. Baker
Represented By: David Hardwick Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?