Vu v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Timothy Conn Vu
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv01063
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation. Response due 6/11/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR UNITED STATES TO ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Hurley, Charles) (Filed on 3/31/2021) Modified on 4/9/2021 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/4/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Internal Revenue Service on 2/16/2021, filed by Timothy Conn Vu. (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on US Attorney General on 2/16/2021, filed by Timothy Conn Vu. (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on US Attorney on 2/24/2021, filed by Timothy Conn Vu. (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Timothy Conn Vu.. (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Vu shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit B in 3 parts due to size - re #1 Complaint filed by Timothy Conn Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15564799). Filed by Timothy Conn Vu. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hone, Aubrey) (Filed on 2/11/2021) Modified on 2/11/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vu v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Charles Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Conn Vu
Represented By: Aubrey Hone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?