Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV) et al v. WageWorks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund and Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV)
Defendant: Colm M. Callan, WageWorks, Inc. and Joseph L. Jackson
Case Number: 3:2021cv01140
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Please re-file in its entirety in the lower case number. Re: #25 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION T O CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio. Service waived by WageWorks, Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio. Service waived by Colm M. Callan waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio. Service waived by Joseph L. Jackson waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence Rolnick. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence M. Rolnick ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608560.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/23/2021 filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2021.Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/4/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio.. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Hampson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608642.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/23/2021 filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Marc B. Kramer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608609.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/23/2021 filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 23, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incomplete PDF attached.Please attach a true and correct copy of a certificate of good standing for each application and re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Marc B. Kramer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608609.) filed by Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, #9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence M. Rolnick ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608560.) filed by Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, #11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Hampson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608642.) filed by Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Hampson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608642.) filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Marc B. Kramer ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608609.) filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence M. Rolnick ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15608560.) filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Colm M. Callan, Joseph L. Jackson, and WageWorks, Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Statement Plaintiffs' Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Statement Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colm M. Callan, Joseph L. Jackson, WageWorks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15581471.). Filed byAlger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio, Alger Small Cap Growth Fund, Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Small Cap Focus Fund, Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV), Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV) et al v. WageWorks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Focus Fund
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Portfolio
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Weatherbie Specialized Growth Fund
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Growth Portfolio
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Growth Fund
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund (Alger SICAV)
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Small Cap Growth Institutional Fund
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund (Alger SICAV)
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colm M. Callan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WageWorks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?