Crabtree v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Patrick Crabtree
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01661
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 9, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Northern District of Texas, 4:20-cv-01192, Crabtree v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-01661 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 259 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01192. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (mmw)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Monsanto Company ; served on 3/5/2021. (Hernandez, Cristina)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Monsanto Company ; served on 2/23/2021. (Hernandez, Cristina)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiffs to effect service on Defendant by March 8, 2021, or show good cause for the failure or inability to effect service on Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/22/2021) (mmw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patrick Crabtree. (Fitts, Bryant)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (mmw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Payment for #1 Complaint,, filed by Patrick Crabtree. ($400; Receipt number 0539-11315896). (Fitts, Bryant)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Patrick Crabtree. (cea)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company filed by Patrick Crabtree. ($400 paid, receipt no. 0539-11315896) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (cea) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Crabtree
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Eric G. Lasker
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?