Wills v. City of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia S Wills
Defendant: Harbor Patrol, City of Monterey, Monterey Police Department and Montage Health
Case Number: 3:2021cv01998
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Cyrus A. Tabari (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tabari, Cyrus) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Montage Health.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service -Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Wagster, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Montage Health. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/21/2021. Replies due by 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Wagster, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Monterey.. (Salameh, Karin) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Montage Health served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia S Wills (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #11 Summons Issued (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Montage Health. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Harbor Patrol, Monterey Police Department, City of Monterey. Service waived by Harbor Patrol waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021; Monterey Police Department waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021; City of Monterey waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 26, 2021 Service packet emailed to Monterey City Attorney's Office. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Montage Health. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Monterey. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cynthia S Wills. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Caseload Rebalancing Judge no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021) ).
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cynthia S Wills.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: VIOLATION EIGHTH and FOURTEENTH AMENDMENTS 42 U.S.C. 1983; TITLE 18 U.S.C. 242; TITLE III ADA 42 U.S.C.; UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT 51; THE REHABILITATION ACT 1973 504 29 U.S.C. 701; NEGLIGENCE; INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS COMPENSATORY and PUNITIVE/ EXEMPLARY DAMAGES; jury demand; against All Defendants. Filed by Cynthia S. Wills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wills v. City of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Patrol
Represented By: Karin Krattli Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monterey
Represented By: Karin Krattli Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Police Department
Represented By: Karin Krattli Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montage Health
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Wagster
Represented By: Cyrus A. Tabari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia S Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?