Stewart-Alexander v. Saks & Company LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Shaquille Stewart-Alexander
Defendant: Saks Incorporated and Saks & Company LLC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02384
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Emily Hayward (Hayward, Laura) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Saks & Company LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Saks Incorporated for Saks & Company LLC.. (Stockton, Julie) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)) with Exhibit A filed bySaks & Company LLC., Saks Incorporated. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Stockton, Julie) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Saks & Company LLC., Saks Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/2/2021. Replies due by 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LU ZHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6)))(Stockton, Julie) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shaquille Stewart-Alexander Saks & Co LLC (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shaquille Stewart-Alexander Re Saks Incorporated (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, July 1, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shaquille Stewart-Alexander.. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Saks & Company LLC., Saks Incorporated.. (Stockton, Julie) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Saks & Company LLC., Saks Incorporated and Shaquille Stewart-Alexander. (Stockton, Julie) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/23/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Saks & Company LLC. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Saks Incorporated. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Shaquille Stewart-Alexander . (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15783653.). Filed byShaquille Stewart-Alexander. (Feder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart-Alexander v. Saks & Company LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Emily Hayward
Represented By: Julie A. Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks & Company LLC.
Represented By: Laura Emily Hayward
Represented By: Julie A. Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaquille Stewart-Alexander
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?