Liu v. Aslam et al
Plaintiff: Zheng Liu
Defendant: Mohammad Aslam, Foster City, Michael Acosta, Douglas Nix, Foster City Police Department and City of Foster City
Case Number: 3:2021cv02394
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zheng Liu.. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/28/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Acosta, Mohammad Aslam, City of Foster City, Foster City Police Department, Douglas Nix. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 6/4/2021. Replies due by 6/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Danielle) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Acosta, Mohammad Aslam, City of Foster City, Foster City Police Department, Douglas Nix.. (Lewis, Danielle) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/24/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for an Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Michael Acosta, Mohammad Aslam, City of Foster City, Foster City Police Department, Douglas Nix. (Lewis, Danielle) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zheng Liu. Foster City Police Department served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michael Acosta, Mohammad Aslam, Foster City, Foster City Police Department, and Douglas Nix. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Zheng Liu . (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for racketeering and civil rights violations against Michael Acosta, Mohammad Aslam, Foster City, Foster City Police Department, Douglas Nix ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15785659.). Filed byZheng Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please submit one summons with an attachment listing all defendants to be served. Please re-file to correct this issue. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Zheng Liu (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Aslam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zheng Liu
Represented By: Zheng Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Aslam
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Acosta
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Nix
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster City Police Department
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Foster City
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?