Pacaso Inc. et al v. City of St. Helena et al
Plaintiff: PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC and Pacaso Inc.
Defendant: Mayor Geoff Ellsworth, City of St. Helena, City Attorney Ethan Walsh and Planning & Building Maya DeRosa
Case Number: 3:2021cv02493
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Declaration of Ashley Phillips in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, correction of #[21-1] filed byPAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint - Special Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Fifth Claim in the Complaint ) filed by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Phillips and Exs. 1-9)(Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh. (Northcutt, Damian) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Plaintiffs Pacaso Inc. and PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses #17 Answer to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/2/2021. Replies due by 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIFTH CLAIM IN THE #1 COMPLAINT FOR INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/1/2021. Replies due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damian Moos In Support of, #2 Declaration of Ethan Walsh In Support of, #3 Exhibit A - F to Decl. of Ethan Walsh, #4 Declaration of Maya DeRosa In Support of, #5 Exhibit A - I to Decl. of Maya DeRosa, #6 Proposed Order)(Moos, Damian) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh. (Moos, Damian) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANY MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/30/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULEFOR ANY MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #14 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO re #1 COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANY MOTION TO DISMISS filed by City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh. (Moos, Damian) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc. re #11 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacaso Inc., PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC. City of St. Helena served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Maya DeRosa served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Geoff Ellsworth served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Ethan Walsh served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Mayor Geoff Ellsworth, #2 Proof of Service on Planning and Building Director Maya DeRosaGeoff Ellsworth, #3 Proof of Service on City Attorney Ethan Walsh)(Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/09/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc... (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Notice to Counsel: Summons cannot be issued to Doe Defendants. Counsel is directed to remove Doe Defendants #1-5 from the summons and re-file. [err102] Th is filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/20/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC, Pacaso Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand For: (1) Declaratory Judgment; (2) Due Process Violation; (3) Selective Enforcement; (4) Invalid Use of Municipal Authority; and (5) Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage against City of St. Helena, Maya DeRosa, Geoff Ellsworth, Ethan Walsh ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15804516.). Filed byPacaso Inc., PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacaso Inc. et al v. City of St. Helena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAC 6 CA 2021 LLC
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Represented By: Caroline W Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacaso Inc.
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Represented By: Caroline W Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Geoff Ellsworth
Represented By: Tyler D. Anthony
Represented By: Damian Arenz Northcutt
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Helena
Represented By: Tyler D. Anthony
Represented By: Damian Arenz Northcutt
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Attorney Ethan Walsh
Represented By: Tyler D. Anthony
Represented By: Damian Arenz Northcutt
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning & Building Maya DeRosa
Represented By: Tyler D. Anthony
Represented By: Damian Arenz Northcutt
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?