Bledsoe v. Granberry et al
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Defendant: Shawn Granberry, Thomas D. McElroy, Toni McElroy, Hip Hop T.V., Jay Williams and Watch Now Entertainment
Case Number: 3:2021cv02604
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donnell Bledsoe. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by April 23, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Mailed to Plaintiff via USPS on 4/13/2021. (NEF)
April 9, 2021 Filing 16 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01648. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 9, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Yin, K)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/8/2021 TRANSFERRING this action to the USDC for the Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shawn Granberry, Thomas D. McElroy, Jay Williams by Donnell Bledsoe. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shawn Granberry, Thomas D. McElroy, Jay Williams by Donnell Bledsoe.(Reader, L)
October 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/19/2020 DENYING #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING #10 Motion for further leave. Within twenty-eight days from the date of this order, a second amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this, and the 3/24/2020, and that complies with the FRCP and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to AMEND the #5 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Donnell Bledsoe. (Kaminski, H)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
July 21, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT #8 Blue Flash Drive containing Exhibit 777 from Donnell Bledsoe. (Text only entry) (Becknal, R)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING: Blue Flash Drive containing Exhibit 777 by Donnell Bledsoe. (York, M)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Donnell Bledsoe re #5 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (York, M)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re copyright infringement by Donnell Bledsoe. (Kastilahn, A)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Donnell Bledsoe.(Kastilahn, A)
March 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/24/2020 DISMISSING the #1 Complaint with leave to amend and GRANTING plaintiff 28 days to file an amended complaint. (Coll, A)
August 23, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Huang, H)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donnell Bledsoe. (Huang, H)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT DAMAGES by Donnell Bledsoe. (Huang, H)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Donnell Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. Granberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hip Hop T.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watch Now Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?