Estell v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Estell
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02749
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Karen Shanks. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard Paul. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15946008.) filed by Cathy Estell. (Shanks, Karen) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15940498.) filed by Cathy Estell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cathy Estell RE APRIL 30, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND STANDING ORDERS (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cathy Estell. Service waived by All Defendants. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15888156.) filed by Cathy Estell. (Hotze, Patrick) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cathy Estell.. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services, Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15847757.). Filed byCathy Estell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Fitzpatrick, Bernard) (Filed on 4/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estell v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Estell
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Karen Cannon Shanks
Represented By: Patrick OConner Hotze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?