Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Defendant: U.S. Department of State and U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2021cv02844
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of State. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2021.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/18/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus.. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of State. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/4/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of State ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15860922.). Filed byAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/20/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Willis Hon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?