Smith v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dale Smith
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Chevron USA Inc. and Syngenta AG
Case Number: 3:2021cv03059
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). by MDL Panel on 6/17/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Southern District of Illinois as case 3:21-pq-00627 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR STAY PENDING POTENTIAL TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Motion for Stay Pending Potential Transfer of this Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Willenburg, Don) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Chevron USA Inc.. (Levin, Jason) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA Inc.. (Levin, Jason) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. Related cases are 21-cv-3047-KAW, 21-cv-3048-LB, 21-cv-3049-JCS, 21-cv-3051-SK, and 21-cv-2083-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/19/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION and ORIGINAL COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL STANDING ORDERS FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS S. HIXSON, DISCOVERY STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS S. HIXSON, and STANDING ORDER FOR ALL JUDGES OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA served on CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. on April 28, 2021, filed by Dale Smith. (Policastro, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTIO (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT), ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT), Civil Cover Sheet (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT), CIVIL STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS S. HIXSON (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT), DISCOVERY STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS S. HIXSON (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT), STANDING ORDER FOR ALL JUDGES OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA CONTENTS OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Received May 5, 2021 at 5:19am EDT) served on SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION LLC on 05/13/2021, filed by Dale Smith. (Policastro, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Dale Smith of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Luff, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chevron USA Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Policastro, Eric) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15892812.). Filed byDale Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Policastro, Eric) (Filed on 4/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Represented By: Don Willenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc.
Represented By: Jason Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Smith
Represented By: Eric Asher Policastro
Represented By: Patrick Allen Luff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?