Smith v. Gutierrez
Defendant: G. Gutierrez
Petitioner: Christopher Leslie Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv03203
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: James Donato
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Central District of California. New case number 2:21-cv-04668. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) Modified on 6/8/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/4/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 6/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Leslie Smith.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Leslie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Signed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Christopher Leslie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 14, 2021 Corrected petitioner's inmate number (from 66852-097) and zip code (from 93496). Remailed notices to petitioner. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/7/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Unsigned Petition. Petition on Form due by 6/7/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by G. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 (UNSIGNED) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Christopher Leslie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (ljf, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Leslie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?