Estate of Donald Nelson et al v. County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Donald Nelson Estate of, Donna Trigg, Ellen Agustine, Lee Nelson, Norma Nelson, Dorothy Richard, Lugene Nelson, Pearl Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Otha Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Florene Nelson- Warren and Estate of Donald Nelson
Defendant: Officer Leo Martinez Contrares, City Of Oakland, Deputy Travis Egan, County of Alameda, California Forensic Medical Group and Officer Leo Martinez-Contreras
Case Number: 3:2021cv03225
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCalifornia Forensic Medical Group. (Varanini, Jerome) (Filed on 6/20/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. Leo Martinez-Contreras served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. Travis Egan served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. County of Alameda served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. City Of Oakland served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. California Forensic Medical Group served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on August 6, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used for Summons returned executed. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety using co rrect Summons Returned Executed event. Re: #18 Certificate of Service,, filed by Otha Nelson, Norma Nelson, Lee Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Jimmie Nelson, Dorothy Richard, Estate of Donald Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Donna Trigg, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Lee Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Norma Nelson, Otha Nelson, Pearl Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Effie Powell-Ross, Dorothy Richard, Donna Trigg (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service for service on City of Oakland, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service for service on County of Alameda, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service for service on Deputy Travis Egan, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service for service on Officer Leo Contrares)(Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by County of Alameda, Travis Egan. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/30/2021. Replies due by 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Alameda, Travis Egan.. (Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to California Forensic Medical Group, City Of Oakland, County of Alameda, Travis Egan, Leo Martinez-Contreras. (Attachments: #1 County of Alameda, #2 Trevor Egan, #3 City of Oakland, #4 Leo Martinez-Contreras)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Summons Issued as to California Forensic Medical Group, City Of Oakland, County of Alameda, Travis Egan, Leo Martinez-Contreras. (Attachments: #1 County of Alameda, #2 Travis Egan, #3 City of Oakland, #4 Leo Martinez-Contreras)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ellen Agustine, Estate of Donald Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Lee Nelson, Lugene Nelson, Norma Nelson, Otha Nelson, Pearl Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Effie Powell-Ross, Dorothy Richard, Donna Trigg (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: reminder to file proposed summons for defendants to be served (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against California Forensic Medical Group, City Of Oakland, County of Alameda, Deputy Travis Egan, Officer Leo Martinez Contrares ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15913473.). Filed byDorothy Richard, Norma Nelson, Ellen Agustine, Donald Nelson Estate of, Lugene Nelson, Florene Nelson- Warren, Pearl Nelson, Donna Trigg, Otha Nelson, Jimmie Nelson, Effie Powell-Ross, Lee Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lessem, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Donald Nelson et al v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Nelson Estate of
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Trigg
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Agustine
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Richard
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lugene Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otha Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Effie Powell-Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florene Nelson- Warren
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Donald Nelson
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen Colleen Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Leo Martinez Contrares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Travis Egan
Represented By: Kevin E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Kevin E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Leo Martinez-Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?