Parson v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Parson
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Chevron USA, Inc. and Syngenta AG
Case Number: 3:2021cv03229
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel on 6/17/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)Case opened in Southern District of Illinois as 3:21-pq-00631, filed 06/17/2021. Modified on 6/17/2021 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lloyd Parson.. (Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Lloyd Parson . (Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NO PROCESS- COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15913792). Filed by Lloyd Parson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parson v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Parson
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?