Mozzone et al v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rod Dunsmore and Anthony Mozzone
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv03532
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/16/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rod Dunsmore, Anthony Mozzone.. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint (ECF 1) and Exhibit A (ECF 1-1) (Unopposed) filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryssemus, #2 Declaration of Clemens, #3 Declaration of Hutton with Exhibits A and B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #5 Redacted Version of Document, #6 Unredacted Version of Document, #7 Stipulation in Support of of Unopposed Administrative Motion to Seal)(Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/9/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #6 STIPULATION PROVISIONALLY SEALING COMPLAINT (ECF 1) AND EXHIBIT A (ECF 1-1). Motions due by 5/28/2021.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, TO PROVISIONALLY SEAL COMPLAINT (ECF 1) AND EXHIBIT A (ECF 1-1) filed by Salesforce.com, Inc., Anthony Mozzone, and Rod Dunsmore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2021 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Salesforce.com, Inc.. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/25/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Salesforce.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15953439.). Filed by Anthony Mozzone, Rod Dunsmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FY20Comp Plan, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mozzone et al v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Dunsmore
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mozzone
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary P Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?