Boehning v. ContextLogic Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerrett Boehning
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Stephanie Tilenius, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Joe Lonsdale, Tanzeen Syed, Brett Just, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Ari Emanuel, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Rajat Bahri, Academy Securities, Inc., Hans Tung, Julie Bradley, Jacqueline Reses, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, Piotr Szulczewski, UBS Securities LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, ContextLogic Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC and Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2021cv03671
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/15/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Academy Securities, Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, UBS Securities LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for BofA Securities, Inc. ; Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, LP for William Blair & Company, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc., Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC for UBS Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,; Corporate Parent Cowen Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC; Corporate Parent J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC ; Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henderson O'Leary (O'Leary, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Han Wang (Wang, Lucy) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene Sachi Shimada (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Response to Complaint filed by Rajat Bahri, Julie Bradley, ContextLogic Inc., Ari Emanuel, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Jacqueline Reses, Tanzeen Syed, Piotr Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rajat Bahri, Julie Bradley, ContextLogic Inc., Ari Emanuel, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Jacqueline Reses, Tanzeen Syed, Piotr Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by ContextLogic Inc. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz on behalf of ContextLogic Inc., Piotr Szulczewski, Rajat Bahri, Brett Just, Julie Bradley, Ari Emanuel, Joe Lonsdale, Tanzeen Syed, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, and Jacqueline Reses (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Kahn on behalf of ContextLogic Inc., Piotr Szulczewski, Rajat Bahri, Brett Just, Julie Bradley, Ari Emanuel, Joe Lonsdale, Tanzeen Syed, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, and Jacqueline Reses (Kahn, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Academy Securities, Inc., Rajat Bahri, BofA Securities, Inc., Julie Bradley, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., ContextLogic Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Ari Emanuel, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Jacqueline Reses, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Tanzeen Syed, Piotr Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, UBS Securities LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 6/7/2021. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2021: #1 Scheduling Order) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Litigation Reform Act against Academy Securities, Inc., Rajat Bahri, BofA Securities, Inc., Julie Bradley, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., ContextLogic Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Ari Emanuel, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Jacqueline Reses, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Tanzeen Syed, Piotr Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, UBS Securities LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15974949.). Filed byJerrett Boehning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehning v. ContextLogic Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Tilenius
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lonsdale
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanzeen Syed
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Just
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Emanuel
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajat Bahri
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Tung
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bradley
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Reses
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Seelaus & Co., LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piotr Szulczewski
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextLogic Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Lucy Han Wang
Represented By: Robert Henderson O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrett Boehning
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?