Thomas v. Thomas
Petitioner: Miriam Thomas
Respondent: John Thomas
Amicus Curiae: Suzanne Simpkins
Case Number: 3:2021cv03686
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION Permission to travel out of state with children ) to Respondent's Motion re interim orders by Miriam Thomas. (Lee, Erika) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/22/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2022 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2022 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse vacating #29 July 18, 2022, Order. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #25 Motion for Interim Order. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: The hearing on #25 Respondent's motion for permission to travel is rescheduled to 7/22/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons gra nted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 27 Brief re #25 MOTION Permission to travel out of state with children filed by John Thomas. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 7/8/2022) Modified on 7/8/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2022 Filing 26 Declaration of John Thomas in Support of #25 MOTION Permission to travel out of state with children filed byJohn Thomas. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION Permission to travel out of state with children filed by John Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 10:00 AM in Do Not Use Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 7/15/2022. Replies due by 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order)(Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 7/8/2022) Modified on 7/22/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/22/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 05/23/2022. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 13, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION re Trial Setting filed by John Thomas. (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for case management conference held on 5/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The parties confirm that they are actively working toward settlement. On or before 5/13/2022, the parties shall submit a joint written proposal regarding case schedule. The aforementioned submission shall also address whether the parties want to engage in a settlement conference with a magistrate judge. Digital Recording Time: 2:03 - 2:12. Petitioner Attorney: Erika Amber Lee. Respondent Attorney: Brent Desmond Seymour. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2022) Modified on 5/9/2022 (shy, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2022 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The case management conference, which is set for 5/6/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telep hone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Respondent's filed by John Thomas. (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: In light of the parties' representation that they are progressing towards a settlement #18 , this Friday's case management conference will be rescheduled to May 6, 2022. The parties must file an updated joint case management statement by April 29, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Miriam Thomas. (Lee, Erika) (Filed on 2/25/2022) Modified on 2/28/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Status Conference is rescheduled to 3/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 1/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Plaintiff's counsel reports that the parties are engaged in private mediation and may be close to resolution. A Status Conference is set for 3/4/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. A written updated must be filed by 2/25/2022. Recorded via Zoom: 2:15 - 2:18. Plaintiff Attorney: BJ Fadem. Defendant Attorney: Brent Seymour. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The further case management conference, which is set for 1/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: Having reviewed the recent joint case management statement #13 , in which the parties explain that they have engaged a mediator and soon expect to begin substantive mediation, the Court will continue this Friday's case management conference until January 7, 2022. A revised joint case management statement is due on January 4, 2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2022.This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Alex G. Tse on 10/27/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Miriam Thomas. (Lee, Erika) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The further case management conference, which is set for 10/29/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedin gs held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for initial case management conference held before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The parties intend to pursue private mediation. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 10/29/2021 at 2:00 PM by Videoconference Only. An updated joint case management conference statement is due by 10/22/2021. The aforementioned statement should update the Court as to whether a mediator has been selected and whether a mediation session has been scheduled. Recorded via Zoom: 2:01 - 2:05. Plaintiff Attorneys: Erika Amber Lee and BJ Fadem. Defendant Attorney: Brent Seymour. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Miriam Thomas.. (Lee, Erika) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Thomas.. (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT for August 20, 2021 filed by John Thomas. (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Erika Amber Lee (Lee, Erika) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The case management conference, which is set for 8/20/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/20 21)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT Re: Consent or Declination. Petitioner and Respondent shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/13/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) Modified on 8/6/2021 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Response to Petition for Return of Minor Children to Australia Under the Hague Convention (Notice of Removal) by John Thomas. (Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Hague Petition from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is HF21092840. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15977023). Filed byJohn Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Return of Children, #2 Exhibit Exh A to Petition, #3 Exhibit Exh B to Petition, #4 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #5 Exhibit Article 16 Motion, #6 Exhibit Memo of Points and Authorities, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Petitioner (1), #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Petitioner (2), #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Australian Law, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Seymour, Brent) (Filed on 5/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miriam Thomas
Represented By: Erika Amber Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Thomas
Represented By: Brent Desmond Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Suzanne Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?