Open Text Inc. v. Beasley
Plaintiff: Open Text Inc.
Defendant: Michelle Beasley
Case Number: 3:2021cv03986
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2021 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-1(b), motion hearing re: #12 and #21 set 7/15/2021 is VACATED. Court will decide motions on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Immediate Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c)) ) filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mindy M. Wong)(Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION ) filed byMichelle Beasley. (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Immediate Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c)) ) filed byMichelle Beasley. (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION ) filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #8 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 Statement of Non-Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 23 Declaration of Mindy M. Wong in Support of #21 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Immediate Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c)) filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 22 Brief re #21 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Immediate Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c)) filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand (Motion for Immediate Remand to State Court and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c)) filed by Open Text Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/22/2021. Replies due by 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Sensitive Document re #4 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal,, ) filed byMichelle Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Raye Mitchell, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4, #3 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 Declaration of Mindy M. Wong in Support of #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Sensitive Document re #4 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 Declaration of Christopher Goldenstein in Support of #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Sensitive Document re #4 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed byOpen Text Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Sensitive Document re #4 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Open Text Inc.. Responses due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR HEARING ON 7/15/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearing re #12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION set for 7/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Open Text Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Open Text Corporation for Open Text Inc.. (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 Brief re #12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION filed byMichelle Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION filed by Michelle Beasley. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 6/16/2021. Replies due by 6/23/2021. (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michelle Beasley re #6 Amended Notice of Removal, (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Open Text Inc... (Wong, Mindy) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Michelle Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michelle Beasley.. (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Open Text Inc.. Filed byMichelle Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Notice of Removal- Incorrect Page Included at End. by M Beasley. (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 5/26/2021)**Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 6/1/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/9/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by M Beasley . (Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court San Mateo. Their case number is 21-CIV-01470. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16012082). Filed byM Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Corres Open Text Corproation Assist. Gen Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 Open Text Corporation Commission Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 Notice of Removal to State Court/Parties)(Mitchell, Raye) (Filed on 5/26/2021) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 6/1/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Text Inc. v. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Text Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Lee Landry
Represented By: Mindy Monhai Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Beasley
Represented By: Raye Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?