Cargoway Management Ltd v. Sklyar et al
Plaintiff: Cargoway Management Ltd
Defendant: Sterling Bank & Trust FSB, Security Finance Company Market doing business as Security Financial Services, Cargoway Management, LLC, FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC, BIT Residence, LLC, Yefim Sklyar and Security Finance Company Market a business organization doing business as Security Financial Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv04417
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byCargoway Management Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul A. Reynolds, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reynolds, Paul) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Security Finance Company Market shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by August 10, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Security Finance Company Market. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/9/2021. Replies due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Jason) (Filed on 7/26/2021) Modified on 7/28/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #26 Stipulation to Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #24 Stipulation to amend briefing schedule and continue hearing. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Yefim Sklyar, Cargoway Management, LLC, and BIT Residence, LLC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities [F.R.Civ.P 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6)]). Responses due by 7/29/2021. Replies due by 8/12/2021. Motion Hearing reset for 8/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 27 SECOND STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Sterling Bank & Trust FSB. (Chau, Stacey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC. (Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. Security Finance Company Market served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Yefim Sklyar, Cargoway Management, LLC, and BIT Residence, LLC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities [F.R.Civ.P 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6)]) filed by Cargoway Management Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reynolds, Paul) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sterling Bank & Trust FSB.. (Lowenthal, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Sterling Bank & Trust FSB. (Lowenthal, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. Security Finance Company Market served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. Yefim Sklyar served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. BIT Residence, LLC served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. Sterling Bank & Trust FSB served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargoway Management Ltd. Cargoway Management, LLC served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC.. (Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities [F.R.Civ.P 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6)]) filed by BIT Residence, LLC, Cargoway Management, LLC, Yefim Sklyar. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/15/2021. Replies due by 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Fillerup) (Fillerup, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/1/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by BIT Residence, LLC, Cargoway Management, LLC, Yefim Sklyar (Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons [Civil L.R. 3-15] ) (Fillerup, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BIT Residence, LLC, Cargoway Management, LLC, Yefim Sklyar.. (Fillerup, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Address and phone number for attorney Jeffrey L. Fillerup updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by July 14, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Stipulation extending time to respond to complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC. (Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cargoway Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BIT Residence, LLC, Cargoway Management, LLC, FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC, Security Finance Company Market, Yefim Sklyar, Sterling Bank & Trust FSB. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargoway Management Ltd (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cargoway Management Ltd (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duty against BIT Residence, LLC, Cargoway Management, LLC, FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC, Security Finance Company Market, Yefim Sklyar, Sterling Bank & Trust FSB (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-16058851.). Filed by Cargoway Management Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reynolds, Paul) (Filed on 6/9/2021) Modified on 6/10/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargoway Management Ltd v. Sklyar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Bank & Trust FSB
Represented By: Stacey C. Quan
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Finance Company Market doing business as Security Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargoway Management, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Represented By: Michael Alan Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FJM Private Mortgage Fund, LLC
Represented By: Jason L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIT Residence, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Represented By: Michael Alan Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yefim Sklyar
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Represented By: Michael Alan Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Finance Company Market a business organization doing business as Security Financial Services
Represented By: Jason Edward Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargoway Management Ltd
Represented By: Paul Anthony Reynolds
Represented By: Erwin Jay Shustak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?