Green County Fiscal Court et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States et al
Plaintiff: Washington County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court and Ohio County Fiscal Court
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. and McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv04536
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-00035. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER from ND/CA re MDL 2996. (KJA)
June 11, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Western District of Kentucky, 1:21-cv-00035-GNS, Green County Fiscal Court v. McKinsey & Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv04536-CRB pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2021 granting #10 Motion to Stay. All further proceedings in this Action are stayed pending resolution of McKinsey's Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in MDL No. 2996 on March 5, 2021. cc: Counsel (CDF)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2021 granting #9 Proposed Agreed Order. The time within which Defendants may respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on March 5, 2021. cc: Counsel (CDF)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNOPPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2021 granting #6 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel and #8 Proposed Agreed Order. Court finds Plaintiffs' counsel have satisfied the requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 sufficiently to be designated as interim class counsel. Court designates Michael D. Grabhorn, Andrew M. Grabhorn, and William D. Nefzger as Interim Class Counsel for the putative class of Kentucky County Fiscal Courts and Home Rule Cities. cc: Counsel (CDF)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lockaby, Amanda)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court, Washington County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order Unopposed re DN #6 by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court, Washington County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael) Modified to add text on 3/25/2021 (CDF).
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Motion to Transfer by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit B - Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Exhibit C - Schedule of Actions, #4 Exhibit D - Dockets and Complaints of Actions Sought to be Consolidated, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of James L. Bernard) (Stewart, Kara) Modified to add text on 3/9/2021 (CDF).
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court, Washington County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grabhorn, Michael) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (CDF).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 3/3/2021. This case having been removed from Green Circuit Court and having a pending "Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel" pending at the time of removal; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Plaintiffs shall file an updated motion reflecting the United States District Court case number and header with an updated proposed order no later than 3/12/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent McKinsey & Company, Inc. for McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.. by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.. (Stewart, Kara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Green Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 21-CI-12. cc: Counsel; Green Circuit Court (JWM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., from Green Circuit Court, Case Number 21-CI-12. ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 0644-3296657 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green County Fiscal Court et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menifee County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Henderson, Kentucky
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckinridge County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardin County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?