Lowther v. Tesla Inc.
Plaintiff: Shameim Lowther
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv04735
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/18/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 8/4/2021.
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). copy placed in O:Drive on 7/13/2021.
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tesla Inc. (Attachments: #1 Form USM-285)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shameim Lowther. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering service by United States Marshal. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Copy placed in O:Drive on 6/28/2021. Modified on 6/28/2021 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shameim Lowther. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Tesla Inc. Filed by Shameim Lowther. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowther v. Tesla Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameim Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?