The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv04955
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Western District of Kentucky, 3:21cv00282DJH, The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04955-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00282. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from ND/CA re: MDL 2996 (KJA)
May 28, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lockaby, Amanda)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing by The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky re #4 MOTION for Wayne Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3342583 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Ronald)
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Actions) (Johnson, Ronald)
May 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky re #11 Notice of Deficiency, #12 Notice of Deficiency, #10 Notice of Deficiency, #7 Notice of Deficiency, #16 Notice of Deficiency, #13 Notice of Deficiency, #15 Notice of Deficiency, #17 Notice of Deficiency, #14 Notice of Deficiency, #9 Notice of Deficiency, #8 Notice of Deficiency (Johnson, Ronald)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John Wayne Hogan re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Steve Skalet re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew J. Piers re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Margaret Truesdale re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Leslie A. Goller re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joshua Karsh re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Emily R. Brown re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Cyrus Mehri re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Charles D. Wysong re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Aisha Rich re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Neil L. Henrichsen re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/2/2021. (KJA)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/19/2021 granting #4 Motion for John Wayne Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Wayne Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3342583 by Plaintiff The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Ronald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2021: #3 Certificate in Good Standing - Supreme Court of Florida) (DLW).
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3336643., filed by The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Steve Skalet
Represented By: Emily R. Brown
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Margaret Truesdale
Represented By: Charles D. Wysong
Represented By: Leslie A. Goller
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Neil L. Henrichsen
Represented By: Aisha Rich,
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan,
Represented By: Leslie A. Goller,
Represented By: Margaret Emily Truesdale
Represented By: Neil L Henrichsen,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?