Pope County, Illinois et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eddyville, Illinois and Pope County, Illinois
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC, McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv04964
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00420. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Southern District of Illinois, 3:21-cv-00420-SPM, Pope County, Illinois et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04964-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 26 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) as assigned by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to Northern District of California as part of MDL 2996.(jlrr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Stay and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All further proceedings in this Action are stayed pending resolution of Defendant McKinsey's Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in MDL No. 2996 on March 5, 2021. Additionally, the Court EXTENDS the time within which McKinsey must respond to the Complaint to 30 days after the JPML rules on McKinsey's 1407 Motion. Furthermore, McKinsey's response is only required if the JPML denies McKinseys 1407 Motion with respect to this Action or the JPML grants McKinseys 1407 Motion with respect to this Action and such a response is required by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/25/2021. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court finds Plaintiffs' counsel have satisfied the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 sufficiently to be designated as interim class counsel. The Court designates Mark Bryant, Emily Roark, Teris Swanson, and David Bryant as Interim Class Counsel for the putative class of Illinois local governmental entities. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 5/25/2021. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 21, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-420-SPM. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 21, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #21 Notice (Other) filed by Eddyville, Illinois, Pope County, Illinois. Incorrect filing event used. Filer should have used the event "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" located under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents, which would have placed the document under seal. Docket text and document security have been modified accordingly. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2021 Filing 21 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all paties (Swanson, Teris) Modified on 5/21/2021 (kek).
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE: Eddyville, Illinois and Pope County, Illinois were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Eddyville, Illinois and Pope County, Illinois. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 5/27/2021 (kek)
May 18, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Reitz on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C., Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Reitz, Kurt)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C., and Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C., and Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States on 5/11/2021. Consent due by 6/1/2021 (kek)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C., Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States. (Newman, Stephen)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Julian Newman on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C., Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Newman, Stephen)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Eddyville, Illinois, Pope County, Illinois..Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swanson, Teris)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Emily Ward Roark. $200 fee paid, receipt number 44625013981. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark P. Bryant and #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David G. Bryant. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David G. Bryant $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4470648 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bryant, David)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mckinsey & Company, Inc. United States waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Swanson, Teris)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C. waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Swanson, Teris)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Swanson, Teris)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark P. Bryant $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4470152 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bryant, Mark)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emily Ward Roark by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Roark, Emily)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Eddyville, Illinois, Pope County, Illinois. Document attached is a fillable form. Fillable forms should be converted to non-fillable PDFs prior to filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for future reference only and no further action is needed as to Document #4 . (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Teris N. Swanson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Swanson, Teris)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Teris Swanson does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Eddyville, Illinois, Pope County, Illinois. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-420-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/19/2021 (kek)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4464788.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Teris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope County, Illinois et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddyville, Illinois
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: David G Bryant
Represented By: Mark P Bryant
Represented By: Teris N. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pope County, Illinois
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: David G Bryant
Represented By: Mark P Bryant
Represented By: Teris N. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?