Blount County, Tennessee et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Maryville, Tennessee and Blount County, Tennessee
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC, McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv04969
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern Tennessee, 3:21-0105, Blount County, Tennessee et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-04969 CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1 cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1) to the United States District Court for the NorthernDistrict of California In re: MDL No. 2996. (ADA)
June 23, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (ADA)
April 26, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington DC. (Leeth, Alan)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay.Furthermore, McKinsey SHALL RESPOND to the Complaint 30 days after the JPMLrules on McKinseys 1407 Motion. However, a response is only required if: (a) the JPML denies McKinseys 1407 Motion; or (b) if the JPML grants McKinseys 1407 Motion and such a response is required by the transferee court. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on April 26, 2021. (SAC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington DC of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Related Actions)(Leeth, Alan)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 and for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Leeth, Alan)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Friedman, Jeff)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 4/16/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707123.) by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Conn, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707106.) by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Friedman, Jeff)
April 13, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707106.) filed by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707123.) filed by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee (JBR)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Leeth on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington DC (Leeth, Alan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707123.) by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Conn, Matthew)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707106.) by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Friedman, Jeff)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Kerr, Joseph)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/25/21. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/25/21. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/25/21. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington DC. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorneys Jeff Friedman and Matthew Conn. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 3/30/2021. (GRE)
March 25, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (GRE)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4693304.), filed by Blount County, Tennessee, City of Maryville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to McKinsey & Company, Inc., #2 Summons Summons to McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, #3 Summons Summons to McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington, D.C.)(Kerr, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount County, Tennessee et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Maryville, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeff Friedman
Represented By: Joseph L Kerr, Jr
Represented By: Matthew D. Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blount County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeff Friedman
Represented By: Joseph L Kerr, Jr
Represented By: Matthew D. Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?