Rajpal v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Opvinder S. Rajpal
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05066
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 27 Supplemental Brief re #24 Order, Regarding Choice of Law filed byOpvinder S. Rajpal. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Cohen, Jake) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 26 Supplemental Brief re #24 Order, Regarding Choice of Law filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING RE #9 MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 8/26/2021 TO 9/9/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 9/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2021.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedin gs held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconfere nce Only. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Supplemental briefs are due on or before August 26, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. and shall not exceed ten (10) pages in length. The hearing on Defendants motion to dismiss is hereby rescheduled to September 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING RE: #9 MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 9/2/2021 TO 8/26/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearing re 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. Motion briefing deadlines remain unchanged. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) Modified on 8/16/2021 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2021 Filing 22 (DISREGARD - SEE 23 ) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING RE: #9 MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 8/26/2021 TO 9/2/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 9/2/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2021. Motion briefing deadlines remain unchanged. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2021) Modified on 8/16/2021 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Opvinder S. Rajpal (Robins, Bill) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION filed byOpvinder S. Rajpal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Delta's Motion to Dismiss)(Robins, Bill) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 18, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RENOTICING MOTION HEARING RE #9 MOTION TO DISMISS TO 8/26/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss is renoticed for oral argument on 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Motion briefing deadlines remain unchanged.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of co urt proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. M otion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2021)
July 17, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Order re #15 Renotice motion hearing on Motion to Dismiss the Second and Third Causes of Action in plaintiff's complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/17/2021)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. b> Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference On ly. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Second and Third Causes of Action in the Complaint filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Opvinder S. Rajpal.. (Robins, Bill) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2021) Modified on 7/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2021. Replies due by 7/28/2021. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Delta Air Lines, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Allianz Corporate & Specialty for Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Delta Air Lines, Inc... (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYU (Revised February 16, 2021); NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PROCEDURES FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYU; STANDING ORDER FOR ALL JUDGES OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Effective November 1, 2018); and DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (Filed in the Superior Court of California, San Francisco County) (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-592106. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16131613). Filed byDelta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Other state court documents served), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 6/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajpal v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opvinder S. Rajpal
Represented By: Bill Robins, III
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Mann
Represented By: Jake Cohen,
Represented By: Mohinder S. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?